EP1340858 - CONSTRUCTION MACHINE WITH A DISPLAY UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/36] | DISPLAY DEVICE AND DISPLAY CONTROLLER OF CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY | ||
[2013/25] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.07.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 17.12.2014 [2014/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Construction Machinery Co., Ltd 5-1, Koraku, 2-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 112-8563 / JP | [2013/37] |
Former [2003/36] | For all designated states Hitachi Construction Machinery Co., Ltd 5-1, Kouraku 2-chome, Bunkyou-ku Tokyo 112-0004 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OGURA, Hiroshi Gurandohru-U-II-205 7-14, Hiradai 3-chome Ryugasaki-shi, Ibaraki 301-0003 / JP | 02 /
WATANABE, Hiroshi 1082-66, Tagucho Ushiku-shi, Ibaraki 300-1236 / JP | 03 /
FUJISHIMA, Kazuo Shitina-Kandatsu-C-101 2607-8, Shimoinayoshi Chiyodamachi Niihari-gun, Ibaraki 315-0052 / JP | 04 /
TOMITA, Sadahisa Chiyoda-house 4-306 1828, Niihari, Chiyodamachi Niihari-gun, Ibaraki 315-0051 / JP | [2013/37] |
Former [2003/36] | 01 /
OGURA, Hiroshi Gurandohru-U- U-205 7-14, Hiradai 3-chome Ryugasaki-shi, Ibaraki 301-0003 / JP | ||
02 /
WATANABE, Hiroshi 1082-66, Tagucho Ushiku-shi, Ibaraki 300-1236 / JP | |||
03 /
FUJISHIMA, Kazuo Shitina-Kandatsu C-101 2607-8, Shimoinayoshi, Chiyodamachi Niihari-gun, Ibaraki 315-0052 / JP | |||
04 /
TOMITA, Sadahisa Chiyoda-house 4-306 1828, Niihari, Chiyodamachi Niihari-gun, Ibaraki 315-0051 / JP | Representative(s) | Prins, Adrianus Willem, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [2013/38] |
Former [2003/36] | Prins, Adrianus Willem, et al Vereenigde, Nieuwe Parklaan 97 2587 BN Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 01996652.2 | 09.11.2001 | [2003/36] | WO2001JP09804 | Priority number, date | JP20000350906 | 17.11.2000 Original published format: JP 2000350906 | [2003/36] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0240783 | Date: | 23.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1340858 | Date: | 03.09.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1340858 | Date: | 18.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.05.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | E02F9/26, E02F9/22 | [2013/25] | CPC: |
E02F9/26 (EP,KR,US);
E02F9/2095 (KR);
E02F9/2296 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/36] | E02F9/26 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [2004/21] |
Former [2003/36] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | BAUMASCHINE MIT EINER ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [2013/25] | English: | CONSTRUCTION MACHINE WITH A DISPLAY UNIT | [2013/25] | French: | ENGIN DE TRAVAIL AVEC DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE | [2013/25] |
Former [2003/36] | ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG UND ANZEIGESTEUERGERÄT FÜR EINE BAUMASCHINE | ||
Former [2003/36] | DISPLAY DEVICE AND DISPLAY CONTROLLER OF CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY | ||
Former [2003/36] | DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE ET CONTROLEUR D'AFFICHAGE POUR MATERIEL DE CONSTRUCTION | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.2002 | Translation filed | 10.07.2002 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.2002 | Search fee paid | 10.07.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.07.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.07.2002 | Examination requested [2003/36] | 10.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.07.2009 | Opposition(s) | 19.06.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 15.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 18.09.2013 | FR | 02.12.2013 | [2014/51] |
Former [2014/09] | SE | 18.09.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0811728 (TOPCON CORP [JP]) [A] 3,5-7 * column 3, lines 29-32 * * column 8, lines 53-55; figures 11A,11B *; | [X]WO9809846 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES AUTOMOTIVE [US]) [X] 1,8 * page 3, line 24 - page 6, line 19; figures 1-3 *; | [DA]US5887365 (FUJISHIMA KAZUO [JP], et al) [DA] 2* column 14, line 59 - column 16, line 38; figure 12 * | International search | [Y]JPH05287782 (CATERPILLAR MITSUBISHI LTD); | [Y]JPH06257189 (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY); | [Y]JPH08218444 (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY); | [Y]JPH10103925 (TOPCON CORP); | [Y]JPH11286971 (CATERPILLAR MITSUBISHI LTD) | by applicant | JPH05287782 | US5887365 |