EP1347968 - LFA-1 ANTAGONIST COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.01.2009 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Genentech, Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, CA 94080-4990 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Genentech, Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco CA 94080-4990 / US | ||
Former [2003/40] | For all designated states GENENTECH, INC. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco California 94080 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURDICK, Daniel, J. 1404 Palm Drive Burlingame, CA 94010 / US | 02 /
GADEK, Thomas, R. 2838 Chelsea Drive Oakland, CA 94611 / US | 03 /
MARSTERS James, C., Jr. 809 McKinley Oakland, CA 94610 / US | 04 /
OARE, David 1622 Ralston Avenue Belmont, CA 94002 / US | 05 /
REYNOLDS, Mark, E. 175 Linda Vista Millbrae, CA 94030 / US | 06 /
STANLEY, Mark, S. 284 Lauren Avenue Pacifica, CA 94044 / US | [2003/40] | Representative(s) | Barz, Peter Meissner Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Barz, Peter Patentanwalt Kaiserplatz 2 80803 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/40] | Barz, Peter Patentanwalt Kaiserplatz 2 80803 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01997016.9 | 26.11.2001 | [2003/40] | WO2001US44203 | Priority number, date | US20000253682P | 28.11.2000 Original published format: US 253682 P | [2003/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02059114 | Date: | 01.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1347968 | Date: | 01.10.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C07D405/12, C07D417/12, C07D207/16, A61P37/06, A61K31/34, A61K31/425, A61K31/40 | [2008/21] | CPC data not yet available |
Former IPC [2003/40] | C07D405/12, C07D417/12, C07D207/16, A61P37/06, A61K31/34, A61K31/425, A61K31/40, // (C07D405/12, 307:00), C07D207:00,(C07D417/12, 307:00), C07D277:00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LFA-1 ANTAGONISTEN | [2003/40] | English: | LFA-1 ANTAGONIST COMPOUNDS | [2003/40] | French: | COMPOSES ANTAGONISTES LFA-1 | [2003/40] | Entry into regional phase | 07.05.2003 | National basic fee paid | 07.05.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.05.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.06.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 07.05.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/40] | 15.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.07.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 21.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/10] | 17.10.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2009/10] | Request for further processing for: | 05.07.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 05.07.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.07.2006 | Decision despatched | 11.04.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 11.04.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.04.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2008 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9804247 (BIOGEN INC [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * Tables 1 to 3; pages 162 to 183;; claims 5,TO,7 *; | [A]WO0039081 (ABBOTT LAB [US]) [A] 1-20* claims 12,13,20-23 * |