EP1340369 - CONVERGENT BOX SET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 29.06.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2007 | Refusal of application | published on 01.08.2007 [2007/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bauersachs, Petra Ruitscher-Weg 10 56299 Ochtendung / DE | For all designated states Ciburski, Guido Ruitscherweg 10 56299 Ochtendung / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/36] | For all designated states Bauersachs, Petra Ruitscher-Weg 10 56299 Ochtendung / DE | ||
For all designated states Ciburski, Guido Ruitscherweg 10 56299 Ochtendung / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/36] | Representative(s) | Aue, Hans-Peter Patentanwälte Becker & Aue Tannenring 79 65207 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/36] | Aue, Hans-Peter, Dipl-Ing. Patentanwalt, Tannenring 79 65207 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 01997181.1 | 09.11.2001 | [2003/36] | WO2001EP12960 | Priority number, date | DE2000158347 | 23.11.2000 Original published format: DE 10058347 | [2003/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0243374 | Date: | 30.05.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1340369 | Date: | 03.09.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/00 | [2003/36] | CPC: |
H04N21/47805 (EP,US);
H04N21/4335 (EP,US);
H04N21/47214 (EP,US);
H04N21/4782 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KONVERGENZ-BOXEN-SET | [2003/36] | English: | CONVERGENT BOX SET | [2003/36] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE DECODAGE A CONVERGENCE | [2003/36] | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.2003 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.04.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/36] | 29.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2007/31] | 26.05.2007 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2007/31] | Appeal following examination | 09.09.2004 | Appeal received No. T1328/04 | 06.11.2004 | Statement of grounds filed | 16.05.2007 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 16.05.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.05.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO9850848 (DANMERE LIMITED [GB], et al) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * page 1, line 34 - line 2 * * page 2, line 28 - line 34 * * page 3, line 32 - line 35 * * page 5, line 12 - page 6, line 11 * * page 7, line 27 - page 7, line 39 * * page 8, line 12 - line 14 * * claims 1,2,9,10,22 * * figure 1 * [Y] 4-6,9; | [Y]US5905521 (GATTO JEAN MARIE [FR], et al) [Y] 5,6 * abstract * * column 1, line 46 - column 2, line 27 * * column 3, line 32 - line 62 * * column 6, line 57 - column 7, line 3 * * claims 1,4-7 * * figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US6084638 (HARE CHARLES S [US], et al) [Y] 4,9 * abstract * * column 2, line 25 - line 38 * * column 4, line 18 - line 24 * * column 4, line 38 - line 44 * * column 6, line 18 - line 48 * * column 10, line 14 - line 27 * * column 11, line 45 - line 48 * * claims 1,5,14,15 * * figure 1 *; | [A] - PEKOWSKY S ET AL, "THE SET-TOP BOX AS MULTI-MEDIA TERMINAL", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (199806), vol. 44, no. 3, ISSN 0098-3063, pages 833 - 840, XP000668933 [A] 1-12 * abstract * * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/30.713202 | [A] - "SCART ADAPTER", ELEKTOR ELECTRONICS, ELEKTOR PUBLISHERS LTD. CANTERBURY, GB, (19840901), ISSN 0268-4519, pages 952 - 955, XP002022879 [A] 1,7 * the whole document * |