EP1337545 - ANTISENSE MODULATION OF SRC-1 EXPRESSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.04.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2005 | Change - applicant | published on 29.06.2005 [2005/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Isis Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 2855 Gazelle Court Carlsbad, CA 92010 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/26] | For all designated states Isis Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 1896 Rutherford Road Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US | ||
Former [2003/35] | For all designated states ISIS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. 2280 Faraday Avenue Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BENNETT, C., Frank 1347 Cassins Street Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US | 02 /
COWSERT, Lex, M. 1299 Parrott Drive San Mateo, CA 94402 / US | [2003/35] | Representative(s) | Hallybone, Huw George, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/35] | Hallybone, Huw George, et al Carpmaels and Ransford, 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 01997277.7 | 26.11.2001 | [2003/35] | WO2001US44086 | Priority number, date | US20000723534 | 27.11.2000 Original published format: US 723534 | [2003/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0241836 | Date: | 30.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1337545 | Date: | 27.08.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C07H21/02, C07H21/04, C12Q1/68, C12N15/85, C12N15/86, C12P19/34, A61K48/00 | [2003/35] | CPC: |
C12N15/113 (EP,US);
C07K14/4705 (EP,US);
C12Q1/689 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
C12N2310/315 (EP,US);
C12N2310/321 (EP,US);
C12N2310/3341 (EP,US);
C12N2310/341 (EP,US);
C12N2310/346 (EP,US);
Y02P20/582 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C12N2310/321, C12N2310/3525 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTISENSE-MODULIERUNG DER SRC-1 EXPRESSION | [2003/35] | English: | ANTISENSE MODULATION OF SRC-1 EXPRESSION | [2003/35] | French: | MODULATION ANTISENS DE L'EXPRESSION DE SRC-1 | [2003/35] | Entry into regional phase | 11.06.2003 | National basic fee paid | 11.06.2003 | Search fee paid | 11.06.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.06.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.06.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 11.06.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/35] | 04.04.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5801154 (BARACCHINI EDGARDO [US], et al); | [XP]US6294382 (BENNETT C FRANK [US], et al); | [Y] - MISITI ET AL., "Expression and hormonal regulation of coactivator and corepressor genes", ENDOCRINOLOGY, (199801), vol. 139, no. 5, pages 2493 - 2500, XP002950863 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1210/en.139.5.2493 | [Y] - XU ET AL., "Partial hormone resistance in mice with disruption of the steroid receptor coactivator-1 (SRC-1) gene", SCIENCE, (19980320), vol. 279, pages 1922 - 1925, XP002950864 | [Y] - ONATE ET AL., "Sequence and characterization of a coactivator for the steroid hormone receptor superfamily", SCIENCE, (19951124), vol. 270, pages 1354 - 1357, XP002045755 | [Y] - MILNER ET AL., "Selecting effective antisense reagents on combinatorial oligonucleotide arrays", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (199706), vol. 15, pages 537 - 541, XP002949231 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt0697-537 |