EP1335800 - DEVICE FOR THE CONTINUOUS ADJUSTMENT OF UNBALANCE OF STEERABLE VIBRATION PLATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.2006 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.04.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.05.2006 [2006/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wacker Construction Equipment AG Preussenstrasse 41 80809 München / DE | [2003/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOLLINGER, Josef Wugg-Retzer-Str. 18 84066 Mallersdorf-Pfaffenberg / DE | 02 /
JUNGWIRTH, Norbert Sportplatzstrasse 73 85716 Unterschlei heim / DE | [2003/34] | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/34] | Müller - Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte, Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01997363.5 | 21.11.2001 | [2003/34] | WO2001EP13557 | Priority number, date | DE20002019823U | 22.11.2000 Original published format: DE 20019823 U | [2003/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0242010 | Date: | 30.05.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1335800 | Date: | 20.08.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1335800 | Date: | 08.06.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B06B1/16 | [2003/34] | CPC: |
E02D3/074 (EP,US);
Y10T74/18552 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, LI, SE [2004/21] |
Former [2003/34] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR STUFENLOSEN UNWUCHTVERSTELLUNG BEI LENKBAREN VIBRATIONSPLATTEN | [2003/34] | English: | DEVICE FOR THE CONTINUOUS ADJUSTMENT OF UNBALANCE OF STEERABLE VIBRATION PLATES | [2003/34] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE REGLAGE CONTINU DE MASSES NON EQUILIBREES DE PLAQUES VIBRANTES ORIENTABLES | [2003/34] | Entry into regional phase | 13.05.2003 | National basic fee paid | 13.05.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.05.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.06.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/34] | 20.12.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0070345 (LOSENHAUSEN MASCHINENBAU AG [DE]) [X] 1 * page 5, line 9 - line 36; figure 3 *; | [A]US4759659 (COPIE FERNAND [US]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0951949 (INT CONSTRUCTION EQUIPMENT B V [NL]) [A] 1,4 * abstract * * page 3, column 4, line 8 - line 28 * |