EP1339584 - BRAKE BOOSTER DEVICE, WITH IMPROVED OPERATING CONDITIONS, FOR MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.01.2009 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Wernerstrasse 1 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2008/09] |
Former [2003/36] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GmbH Wernerstrasse 1 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MICHON, Jean-Pierre 19, rue des Sources F-77178 Saint-Pathus / FR | 02 /
LACROIX, Stéphane 14, rue de Villé F-77220 Tournan en Brie / FR | [2003/36] | Representative(s) | Hurwic, Aleksander Wiktor Bosch Systèmes de Freinage Service Brevets 126, rue de Stalingrad 93700 Drancy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/36] | Hurwic, Aleksander Wiktor Bosch Systèmes de Freinage, 126, rue de Stalingrad 93700 Drancy / FR | Application number, filing date | 01997431.0 | 21.11.2001 | [2003/36] | WO2001FR03655 | Priority number, date | FR20000015304 | 24.11.2000 Original published format: FR 0015304 | [2003/36] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0242140 | Date: | 30.05.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1339584 | Date: | 03.09.2003 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1339584 | Date: | 27.02.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B60T13/573 | [2003/36] | CPC: |
B60T8/3275 (EP,US);
B60T13/565 (KR);
B60T13/573 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BREMSKRAFTVERSTÄRKERVORRICHTUNG MIT VERBESSERTEN BETRIEBSBEDINGUNGEN FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUG | [2003/36] | English: | BRAKE BOOSTER DEVICE, WITH IMPROVED OPERATING CONDITIONS, FOR MOTOR VEHICLE | [2003/36] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FREINAGE ASSISTE, A FONCTIONNEMENT AMELIORE, POUR VEHICULE A MOTEUR. | [2003/36] | Entry into regional phase | 24.06.2003 | National basic fee paid | 24.06.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.06.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/36] | 10.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.02.2008 | CY | 27.02.2008 | DK | 27.02.2008 | FI | 27.02.2008 | IE | 27.02.2008 | IT | 27.02.2008 | NL | 27.02.2008 | TR | 27.02.2008 | SE | 27.05.2008 | DE | 28.05.2008 | GR | 28.05.2008 | ES | 07.06.2008 | PT | 21.07.2008 | GB | 21.11.2008 | LU | 21.11.2008 | [2010/47] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
CY | 27.02.2008 | ||
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
IE | 27.02.2008 | ||
IT | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
TR | 27.02.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
DE | 28.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
GB | 21.11.2008 | ||
LU | 21.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
CY | 27.02.2008 | ||
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
IE | 27.02.2008 | ||
IT | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
DE | 28.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
GB | 21.11.2008 | ||
LU | 21.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/01] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
CY | 27.02.2008 | ||
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
IE | 27.02.2008 | ||
IT | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
DE | 28.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
GB | 21.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
CY | 27.02.2008 | ||
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
IE | 27.02.2008 | ||
IT | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
DE | 28.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/33] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
CY | 27.02.2008 | ||
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
IE | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
DE | 28.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
IE | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
DE | 28.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
IE | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
IE | 27.02.2008 | ||
NL | 27.02.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
DK | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SE | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 27.02.2008 | |
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | ES | 07.06.2008 | Cited in | International search | [AD]FR2658466 (BENDIX EUROP SERVICES TECH [FR]) [AD] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5921084 (GAUTIER JEAN PIERRE [FR], et al) [A] 1 * column 10, line 4 - column 13, line 7; figures 5-7 *; | [A]FR2784953 (BOSCH SYST FREINAGE [FR]) [A] 1* column W * |