EP1340052 - FLOW SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.10.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.11.2018 [2018/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2003/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARTMANN, Hans Liebenzeller Weg 2/1 71106 Magstadt / DE | 02 /
PANNEK, Thorsten Hasenbergstrasse 99 70176 Stuttgart / DE | 03 /
KONZELMANN, Uwe Schwalbenweg 14 71679 Asperg / DE | [2003/36] | Application number, filing date | 01997679.4 | 11.10.2001 | [2003/36] | WO2001DE03906 | Priority number, date | DE2000158009 | 23.11.2000 Original published format: DE 10058009 | [2003/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0242723 | Date: | 30.05.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1340052 | Date: | 03.09.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G01F1/684 | [2003/36] | CPC: |
G01F1/6845 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/21] |
Former [2003/36] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STRÖMUNGSSENSOR | [2003/36] | English: | FLOW SENSOR | [2003/36] | French: | CAPTEUR D'ECOULEMENT | [2003/36] | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.2003 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.05.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/36] | 09.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/48] | 10.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/48] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.02.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 02.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 31.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 02.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 17 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4680963 (TABATA OSAMU [JP], et al) [X] 1-6 * column 3, line 42 - column 7, line 34; figures 1-7 *; | [X]US5231878 (ZANINI-FISHER MARGHERITA [US], et al) [X] 1,3,5,6 * column 3, line 28 - column 7, line 56; figures 1-5 *; | [X]US5310449 (HENDERSON H THURMAN [US]) [X] 1,2 * column 3, line 8 - line 22 * * column 5, line 39 - line 49; figure 1 *; | [X]US5311775 (SUSKI JAN [FR], et al) [X] 1,7 * column 5, line 15 - line 61; figures 1-11 *; | [X]WO9836247 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE], et al) [X] 1,7 * page 8, paragraph 3 - page 11, paragraph 1; figures 1-4 *; | [A]DE19752208 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 4-6* column 4, line 8 - line 37; figure 1 * |