EP1346366 - A METHOD FOR NON-DESTRUCTIVE READOUT AND APPARATUS FOR USE WITH THE METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.03.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 22.08.2007 [2007/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thin Film Electronics ASA P.O. Box 1872 Vika 0124 Oslo / NO | [2003/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NORDAL, Per-Erik Bastadryggen 19 N-1387 Asker / NO | [2003/39] | Representative(s) | Ahmad, Sheikh Shakeel Keltie LLP No.1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/39] | Ahmad, Sheikh Shakeel David Keltie Associates Fleet Place House 2 Fleet Place London EC4M 7ET / GB | Application number, filing date | 01997813.9 | 27.11.2001 | [2003/39] | WO2001NO00472 | Priority number, date | NO20000006002 | 27.11.2000 Original published format: NO 20006002 | [2003/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0243070 | Date: | 30.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1346366 | Date: | 24.09.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1346366 | Date: | 27.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 30.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G11C11/22, G11C7/00 | [2003/39] | CPC: |
G11C11/22 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ZERSTÖRUNGSFREIEN AUSLESEN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERWENDUNG MIT DEM VERFAHREN | [2003/39] | English: | A METHOD FOR NON-DESTRUCTIVE READOUT AND APPARATUS FOR USE WITH THE METHOD | [2003/39] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE LECTURE SANS EFFACEMENT | [2003/39] | Entry into regional phase | 19.06.2003 | National basic fee paid | 19.06.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.06.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/39] | 20.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 24.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.04.2005 | CH | 27.04.2005 | LI | 27.04.2005 | TR | 27.04.2005 | GR | 27.07.2005 | SE | 27.07.2005 | PT | 10.10.2005 | CY | 27.11.2005 | IT | 27.11.2005 | IE | 28.11.2005 | LU | 30.11.2005 | MC | 30.11.2005 | [2007/34] |
Former [2007/20] | AT | 27.04.2005 | |
CH | 27.04.2005 | ||
LI | 27.04.2005 | ||
TR | 27.04.2005 | ||
GR | 27.07.2005 | ||
SE | 27.07.2005 | ||
PT | 10.10.2005 | ||
CY | 27.11.2005 | ||
IE | 28.11.2005 | ||
LU | 30.11.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
Former [2007/10] | AT | 27.04.2005 | |
CH | 27.04.2005 | ||
LI | 27.04.2005 | ||
TR | 27.04.2005 | ||
GR | 27.07.2005 | ||
SE | 27.07.2005 | ||
PT | 10.10.2005 | ||
IE | 28.11.2005 | ||
LU | 30.11.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 27.04.2005 | |
CH | 27.04.2005 | ||
LI | 27.04.2005 | ||
TR | 27.04.2005 | ||
GR | 27.07.2005 | ||
SE | 27.07.2005 | ||
PT | 10.10.2005 | ||
IE | 28.11.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 27.04.2005 | |
CH | 27.04.2005 | ||
LI | 27.04.2005 | ||
GR | 27.07.2005 | ||
SE | 27.07.2005 | ||
PT | 10.10.2005 | ||
IE | 28.11.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/30] | AT | 27.04.2005 | |
CH | 27.04.2005 | ||
LI | 27.04.2005 | ||
GR | 27.07.2005 | ||
SE | 27.07.2005 | ||
PT | 10.10.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 27.04.2005 | |
CH | 27.04.2005 | ||
LI | 27.04.2005 | ||
GR | 27.07.2005 | ||
SE | 27.07.2005 | ||
PT | 10.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 27.04.2005 | |
SE | 27.07.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 27.07.2005 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH06275062 ; | [X]JPH05129622 ; | [A]US3132326 (CROWNOVER JOSEPH W); | [A]US5262982 (BRASSINGTON MICHAEL P [US], et al); | [A]US5530667 (OMURA MASAYOSHI [JP], et al); | [X]US5666305 (MIHARA TAKASHI [JP], et al) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, & JP06275062 A 19940930 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO LTD; SYMMETRICS CORP) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, & JP05129622 A 19930525 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO LTD) |