EP1336187 - RADIO FREQUENCY ION SOURCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.01.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE SECRETARY OF STATE FOR DEFENCE DSTL Porton Down Salisbury, Wiltshire SP4 0JQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/34] | For all designated states The Secretary of State of Defence DSTL, Porton Down Salisbury, Wiltshire SP4 0JQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Langford, Marian Lesley Grantley, Church Lane Kingston Canterbury Kent CT4 6HX / GB | 02 /
Cairns, Stuart Neville DSTL Fort Halstead Building S18 Sevenoaks Kent TN14 7BP / GB | 03 /
Marr, Andrew John DSTL Fort Halstead Building S18 Sevenoaks Kent TN14 7BP / GB | 04 /
Pleasants, Ian Blair DRPS Institute of Naval Medicine Crescent Road Alverstoke Gosport PO12 2DL / GB | [2003/41] |
Former [2003/34] | 01 /
Langford, Marian Lesley DSTL Porton Down Salisbury Wiltshire SP4 0JQ / GB | ||
02 /
Cairns, Stuart Neville DSTL Porton Down Salisbury Wiltshire SP4 0JQ / GB | |||
03 /
Marr, Andrew John DSTL Porton Down Salisbury Wiltshire SP4 0JQ / GB | |||
04 /
Pleasants, Ian Blair DSTL Porton Down Salisbury Wiltshire SP4 0JQ / GB | Representative(s) | Beckham, Robert William D/IPR Formalities Section Poplar 2 MOD Abbey Wood 2218 Bristol BS34 8JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/34] | Beckham, Robert William D/IPR Formalities Section, Poplar 2, Mod Abbey Wood Nr. 2218 Bristol BS34 8JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 01997828.7 | 21.11.2001 | [2003/34] | WO2001GB05104 | Priority number, date | GB20000028682 | 24.11.2000 Original published format: GB 0028682 | [2003/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0243100 | Date: | 30.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1336187 | Date: | 20.08.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01J27/00 | [2003/34] | CPC: |
H01J49/105 (EP,US);
H01J27/16 (EP,KR,US);
H01J27/18 (EP,US);
H01J49/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RADIOFREQUENZ-IONENQUELLE | [2003/34] | English: | RADIO FREQUENCY ION SOURCE | [2003/34] | French: | SOURCE D'IONS A FREQUENCE RADIO | [2003/34] | Entry into regional phase | 30.05.2003 | National basic fee paid | 30.05.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.05.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.06.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/34] | 02.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.12.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5684300 (TAYLOR STEPHEN JOHN [GB], et al) [X] 1,5,14 * claims 1,8,9 *; | [PX]WO0075953 (TECHNISPAN LLC [US], et al) [PX] 1,3,8,13,14 * claims 1-24 *; | [X]US4092543 (LEVY WARREN W) [X] 1 * claims 1-8 *; | [X]JPH01244619 ; | [X]JPS63206484 ; | [X]US5849372 (ANNARATONE BEATRICE MARIA [GB], et al) [X] 1 * claims 1,2,12,13 *; | [A]JPH08306499 ; | [A]GB420360 (CONSTANTIN PRODROMOS YAGLOU); | [A]US4630566 (ASMUSSEN JES [US], et al); | [A]US5444258 (GRIGORYAN VLADIMIR G [RU], et al); | [AD]WO9619822 (SECR DEFENCE [GB], et al) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891221), vol. 013, no. 581, Database accession no. (E - 865), & JP01244619 A 19890929 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881223), vol. 012, no. 496, Database accession no. (C - 555), & JP63206484 A 19880825 (NEC CORP) [X] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970331), vol. 1997, no. 03, & JP08306499 A 19961122 (TERAJIMA KAZUO) [A] 1 * abstract * |