EP1359748 - DATA PROCESSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 02.04.2010 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2010 | Refusal of application | published on 05.05.2010 [2010/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/45] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHIDA, Hideki c/o SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 02 /
SATO, Jin c/o SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 03 /
IKEDA, Kazuyuki c/o SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 04 /
NORIZUKI, Takashi c/o SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 05 /
SAKUSABE, Kenichi c/o SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 06 /
KAWAGUCHI, Daisuke c/o SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 07 /
YOSHIKAWA, Munehiro c/o SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [2003/45] | Representative(s) | Robinson, Nigel Alexander Julian, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/45] | Robinson, Nigel Alexander Julian, et al D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 01999110.8 | 28.11.2001 | [2003/45] | WO2001JP10367 | Priority number, date | JP20000362562 | 29.11.2000 Original published format: JP 2000362562 | [2003/45] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0245415 | Date: | 06.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1359748 | Date: | 05.11.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.06.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/24, H04N5/44 | [2005/22] | CPC: |
H04N5/04 (EP,US);
H04L7/00 (KR);
H04N21/43072 (EP,US);
H04B14/04 (KR);
H04L13/08 (KR);
H04N21/23406 (EP,US);
H04N21/426 (EP,US);
H04N21/44004 (EP,US);
H04N21/478 (EP,US);
H04N5/38 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2003/45] | H04N5/44 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/21] |
Former [2003/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | DATENPROZESSOR | [2003/45] | English: | DATA PROCESSOR | [2003/45] | French: | PROCESSEUR DE DONNEES | [2003/45] | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.2003 | Translation filed | 22.05.2003 | National basic fee paid | 22.05.2003 | Search fee paid | 22.05.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.05.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.06.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 23.05.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/45] | 07.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2009 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/18] | 17.11.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.12.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2010/18] | 18.12.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]WO0177852 (ARTEL VIDEO SYSTEMS INC [US], et al) [PX] 1,3-8 * page 27, line 1 - page 30, line 1; figure 2 *; | [X]US5565924 (HASKELL BARIN G [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * column 4, line 34 - column 5, line 45; figures 2,3 *; | [X]US5757465 (SEAGRAVE CHARLES GORDON [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * column 30, line 63 - line 65 *; | [X]EP0797325 (D2B SYSTEMS CO LTD [GB]) [X] 1,3,4,6-8 * column 3, line 14 - line 38 *; | [X]US5966387 (CLOUTIER LEO [US]) [X] 1-3,7,8 * figure 2; claim 7 *; | [X]EP0431319 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,7,8 * page 5, line 14 - page 6, line 23; figure 3 *; | [X]EP0895378 (YAMAHA CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,7,8 * paragraph [0125] * | International search | [Y]JPH09270779 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [Y]JPH0877691 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [XP]JP2001320351 (YAMAHA CORP) | by applicant | US565924 |