EP1273601 - RUBBER-MODIFIED RESIN AND THERMOPLASTIC RESIN COMPOSITION CONTAINING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.01.2009 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.02.2009 [2009/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KANEKA CORPORATION 2-4, Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8288 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/09] | For all designated states KANEKA CORPORATION 2-4, Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8288 / JP | ||
Former [2003/02] | For all designated states KANEKA CORPORATION 2-4, Nakanoshima 3-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8288 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIYATAKE, Nobuo, KANEKA CORPORATION Takasago Plant 1-8, Takasago-cho Miyamae-cho Takasago-shi, Hyoggo 676-0027 / JP | 02 /
TAKAKI, Akira, KANEKA CORPORATION, Takasago Plant 1-8, Takasago-cho Miyamae-cho Takasago-shi, Hyogo 676-0027 / JP | [2003/02] | Representative(s) | Rauh, Peter, et al Vossius & Partner postfach 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/02] | Rauh, Peter A., Dr., et al Vossius & Partner, Postfach 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01999591.9 | 30.11.2001 | [2003/02] | WO2001JP10465 | Priority number, date | JP20000370273 | 05.12.2000 Original published format: JP 2000370273 | [2003/02] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0246257 | Date: | 13.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1273601 | Date: | 08.01.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1273601 | Date: | 27.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.06.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C08F291/00, C08F2/44, C08L51/04, C08L101/00, C08F291/02, C08F265/06, C08F265/04, C08F283/00, C08L33/08, C08L83/04 | [2005/40] | CPC: |
C08L51/085 (EP,KR,US);
C08L51/04 (EP,KR,US);
C08F212/08 (KR);
C08F212/12 (KR);
C08F214/06 (KR);
C08F214/08 (KR);
C08F214/22 (KR);
C08F220/14 (KR);
C08F220/18 (KR);
C08F220/281 (KR);
C08F220/325 (KR);
C08F220/44 (KR);
C08F265/04 (EP,KR,US);
C08F283/12 (EP,KR,US);
C08L25/06 (KR);
C08L25/12 (KR);
C08L25/14 (KR);
C08L27/06 (KR);
| C-Set: |
C08L51/04, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C08L51/04, C08L2666/04 (US,EP);
C08L51/04, C08L2666/14 (US,EP);
C08L51/04, C08L2666/24 (US,EP);
C08L51/085, C08L2666/02 (EP,US);
C08L51/085, C08L2666/04 (EP,US);
C08L51/085, C08L2666/14 (EP,US);
C08L51/085, C08L2666/24 (EP,US); |
Former IPC [2003/02] | C08F291/00, C08F2/44, C08L51/04, C08L101/00 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [2003/02] | Title | German: | KAUTSCHUKMODIFIZIERTES HARZ UND THERMOPLASTISCHE HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG DIE DIESES ENTHÄLT | [2003/02] | English: | RUBBER-MODIFIED RESIN AND THERMOPLASTIC RESIN COMPOSITION CONTAINING THE SAME | [2003/02] | French: | RESINE A CAOUTCHOUC MODIFIE ET COMPOSITION A BASE DE RESINE THERMOPLASTIQUE QUI CONTIENT CETTE RESINE | [2003/02] | Entry into regional phase | 12.07.2002 | Translation filed | 08.08.2002 | National basic fee paid | 08.08.2002 | Search fee paid | 30.08.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.08.2002 | Examination requested [2003/02] | 28.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 04.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5543460 (YAMAMOTO NAOKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * column 7, lines 19-24; example 1 *; | [A]DE19846251 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1-7 * claims 1-3 * * page 2, lines 18-25 * * page 6, lines 9-13 *; | [PA]EP1141058 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [PA] 1-7* claim 1 * | International search | [A]EP0943635 (KANEKA CORP [JP]); | [AP]JP2001261755 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO) |