EP1342005 - FUEL INJECTION SYSTEM FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.2005 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 27.12.2006 [2006/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2003/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EGLER, Walter Eichenweg 8 70839 Gerlingen / DE | 02 /
BOEHLAND, Peter Erfurter Weg 11/1 71672 Marbach / DE | 03 /
KANNE, Sebastian Koenig-Karl-Str. 54 70372 Stuttgart / DE | [2003/37] | Application number, filing date | 01999740.2 | 05.12.2001 | [2003/37] | WO2001DE04531 | Priority number, date | DE2000160811 | 07.12.2000 Original published format: DE 10060811 | [2003/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0246602 | Date: | 13.06.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1342005 | Date: | 10.09.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1342005 | Date: | 22.12.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F02M55/04, F02M63/02 | [2003/37] | CPC: |
F02M55/04 (EP,US);
F02M61/16 (EP,US);
F02M63/0007 (EP,US);
F02M63/0225 (EP,US);
F02M2200/315 (EP,US);
F02M2200/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, TR [2004/22] |
Former [2003/37] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | KRAFTSTOFFEINSPRITZSYSTEM FÜR BRENNKRAFTMASCHINEN | [2003/37] | English: | FUEL INJECTION SYSTEM FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES | [2003/37] | French: | SYSTEME D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT POUR MOTEURS A COMBUSTION INTERNE | [2003/37] | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 07.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/37] | 24.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | TR | 22.12.2004 | [2006/52] | Cited in | International search | [X]DE19957591 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1,3,14,15 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0995902 (NIPPON SOKEN [JP], et al) [X] 1,15 * abstract *; | [X]DE19958249 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1,15 * figure 2 *; | [A]EP1036932 (DELPHI TECH INC [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document * |