EP1225567 - Method and apparatus for speech recognition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.08.2009 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.09.2009 [2009/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2008/42] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2002/30] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Konuma, Tomohiro 255-2, Nagatsuka Odawara-shi, Kanagawa 250-0214 / JP | 02 /
Inoue, Tsuyoshi 6-25-4-602, Sagamihara Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa 229-0031 / JP | 03 /
Endo, Mitsuru 3-33-17-319, Sugao, Miyamae-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 216-0015 / JP | 04 /
Saito, Natsuki 6-62-6, Hachigasaki Matsudo-shi, Chiba 270-0023 / JP | 05 /
Ishida, Akira 304-501, Noborito, Tama-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 214-0014 / JP | 06 /
Kimura, Tatsuya 4-9-17, Minamikurihara Zama-shi, Kanagawa 228-0015 / JP | [2002/30] | Representative(s) | Balsters, Robert, et al Novagraaf International S.A. Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2002/30] | Balsters, Robert, et al Novagraaf International S.A. 25, avenue du Pailly 1220 Les Avanchets - Geneva / CH | Application number, filing date | 02000206.9 | 10.01.2002 | [2002/30] | Priority number, date | JP20010014160 | 23.01.2001 Original published format: JP 2001014160 | [2002/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1225567 | Date: | 24.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1225567 | Date: | 04.02.2004 | [2004/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1225567 | Date: | 15.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G10L15/08 | [2002/30] | CPC: |
G10L15/065 (EP,US);
G10L15/08 (EP,US);
G10L15/1815 (EP,US);
G10L2015/088 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2004/44] |
Former [2002/30] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Spracherkennung | [2002/30] | English: | Method and apparatus for speech recognition | [2002/30] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de reconnaissance de la parole | [2002/30] | Examination procedure | 21.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/25] | 26.04.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 01.09.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5241619 (SCHWARTZ RICHARD M [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * abstract * * column 3, line 30 - line 68 * * column 5, line 35 - line 39 * * column 6, line 26 - line 31 * * column 6, line 66 - line 68 * * column 7, line 8 - line 51 *; | [XA]EP0936598 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1,3,5,7 * abstract * * page 15, line 35 - line 54 *[A] 2,4,6,8; | [XA] - MICHAEL T JOHNSON ET AL, "INTERFACING ACOUSTIC MODELS WITH NATURAL LANGUAGE PROCESSING SYSTEMS", ICSLP 1998, (199810), XP007000635 [X] 1,3,5,7 * abstract * * page 2, column L, line 6 - line 25 * [A] 2,4,6,8 |