EP1331429 - Apparatus for tapping of conduits [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.04.2005 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.06.2005 [2005/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states agru Kunststofftechnik GmbH Ing.-Pesendorfer-Strasse 31 4540 Bad Hall / AT | [2003/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Severa, Gerald Zieherstrasse 14 4540 Bad Hall / AT | 02 /
Pörnbacher, Andreas Wolfgang-Forster-Strasse 1 4452 Ternberg / AT | [2003/31] | Representative(s) | Mai, Oppermann & Partner i.L. Patentanwälte John-F.-Kennedy-Strasse 4 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/31] | Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner GbR Patentanwälte, John-F.-Kennedy-Strasse 4 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 02000745.6 | 12.01.2002 | [2003/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1331429 | Date: | 30.07.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1331429 | Date: | 23.06.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F16L41/06, F16L47/00 | [2003/31] | CPC: |
F16L47/345 (EP,US);
Y10T137/6123 (EP,US);
Y10T408/56245 (EP,US);
Y10T408/56275 (EP,US);
Y10T408/68 (EP,US);
Y10T408/907 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/31] | Extension states | RO | 22.03.2003 | SI | 22.03.2003 | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Anzapfen von Leitungen | [2003/31] | English: | Apparatus for tapping of conduits | [2003/31] | French: | Dispositif pour percer des conduites | [2003/31] | Examination procedure | 22.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/31] | 23.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 11.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0723104 (PLASSON MAAGAN MICHAEL IND LTD [IL]) [A] 1* figures 1-5 *; | [A]EP0736718 (MANIBS SPEZIALARMATUREN [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 1-5 *; | [DX]DE19641803 (MANIBS SPEZIALARMATUREN [DE]) [DX] 1-12 * figures 1-5 *; | [X]DE10021592 (MANIBS SPEZIALARMATUREN [DE]) [X] 1-12 * figures 1-8 * |