EP1223245 - Process for cleaning a pulp of primary fibres [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 06.04.2007 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.04.2007 | Revocation of patent | published on 09.05.2007 [2007/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Voith Paper Fiber Systems GmbH & Co.KG Postfach 2120 88191 Ravensburg / DE | [2005/43] |
Former [2002/29] | For all designated states Voith Paper Fiber Systems GmbH & Co.KG Postfach 2120 88191 Ravensburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gehr, Volker, Dr. Pappelweg 28 88255 Baienfurt / DE | 02 /
Respondek, Peter Rümelinstrasse 15 88213 Ravensburg / DE | 03 /
Kemper, Martin Hirschstrasse 7 88250 Weingarten / DE | 04 /
Schweiss, Peter Gartenstrasse 29 89275 Elchingen / DE | 05 /
Martin, Thomas Dahlienweg 6/3 89129 Langenau / DE | [2002/30] |
Former [2002/29] | 01 /
Gehr, Volker, Dr. Pappelweg 28 88255 Baienfurt / DE | ||
02 /
Respondek, Peter Rümelinstrasse 15 88213 Ravensburg / DE | |||
03 /
Kemper, Martin Hirschstrasse 7 88250 Weingarten / DE | |||
04 /
Schweiss, Peter Gartenstrasse 29 89275 Elchingen / DE | |||
05 /
Martin, Thomas Mozartstrasse 6 89129 Langenau / DE | Application number, filing date | 02000753.0 | 15.07.1997 | [2002/29] | Priority number, date | DE1996135967 | 05.09.1996 Original published format: DE 19635967 | [2002/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1223245 | Date: | 17.07.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1223245 | Date: | 02.06.2004 | [2004/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1223245 | Date: | 26.10.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | D21C9/00, D21C9/02, D21C9/10 | [2002/29] | CPC: |
D21C9/02 (EP);
D21C9/007 (EP);
D21C9/1026 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FI, SE [2002/29] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Reinigung einer Suspension aus Primärfaserstoff | [2002/29] | English: | Process for cleaning a pulp of primary fibres | [2002/29] | French: | Procédé d'épuration d'une suspension de fibres primaires | [2002/29] | Examination procedure | 02.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/05] | 10.03.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP97112005.0 / EP0828026 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
10.07.2006
12.07.2006
ADMISSIBLE Kvaerner Pulping AB Box 1033 651 15 Karlstad / SE | [2006/33] | 31.08.2006 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 12.12.2006 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 19.12.2006 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 29.12.2006 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2007/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0522334 (NALCO CHEMICAL CO [US]) [AD] 1-7 * page 1, line 9 - line 25 * * page 3, line 42 - line 44 *; | [A]DE4317466 (DEGUSSA [DE]) [A] 1-7 * page 2, line 60 - page 3, line 11 *; | [A]WO9606978 (HOFFMAN ENVIRONMENTAL SYSTEMS [US]) [A] 1,7* page 2, line 5 - page 3, line 9 * |