EP1227397 - SIM manager API [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.12.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.01.2014 [2014/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/31] | For all designated states MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vargas, Garret R. 9431 NE 130th Place Kirkland, WA 98034 / US | 02 /
Shen, Alan W. 8216 Corliss Avenue N. Seattle, WA 98103 / US | [2002/31] | Representative(s) | Fischer, Michael Maria, et al Olswang Germany LLP Rosental 4 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/49] | Fischer, Michael Maria, et al Olswang Gemany LLP Maximilianstrasse 13 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/31] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02000960.1 | 16.01.2002 | [2002/31] | Priority number, date | US20010768587 | 25.01.2001 Original published format: US 768587 | [2002/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1227397 | Date: | 31.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1227397 | Date: | 18.04.2007 | [2007/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/445 | [2002/31] | CPC: |
G06F9/44521 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/31] | Title | German: | Anwendungsprogrammierungsschnittstelle für SIM-Karten- Verwaltung | [2002/31] | English: | SIM manager API | [2002/31] | French: | Interface de programmation d'application pour gestionnaire de carte SIM | [2002/31] | Examination procedure | 09.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/47] | 06.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.2010 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 09.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.10.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 10.10.2011 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 01.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/04] | 09.09.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/04] | Appeal following examination | 09.12.2011 | Appeal received No. T0538/12 | 17.02.2012 | Statement of grounds filed | 19.11.2013 | Result of appeal procedure: the application was deemed to be withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.02.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2013 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - FODOR, O.; HASSLER, V., "JavaCard and OpenCard Framework: a Tutorial", EMERGING TECHNOLOGIES AND FACTORY AUTOMATION, 1999. PROCEEDINGS. ETFA '99. 1999 7TH IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, vol. 1, (1999), pages 13 - 22, URL: http://ieeexplore.ieee.org/iel5/6597/17656/00815333.pdf, (20070305), XP002423134 [X] 14-26 * page 14, column 2, line 7 * * page 16, column 1 - column 2 * * page 17, column 1 - column 2 * * page 18, column 1; figure 1 * * page 19, column 2 * * page 21, column 1 - column 2 * | [X] - HERMANN R ET AL, "THE OPENCARD FRAMEWORK", LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE, SPRINGER VERLAG, BERLIN, DE, (2000), ISSN 0302-9743, pages 52 - 70, XP009026269 [X] 16-21 * page 12, line 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/10721064_5 | [A] - "Subscriber Identity Module Application Programming Interface (SIM API) for Java Card", GSM 03.19, (1999), pages 1 - 22, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Specs/html-info/0319.htm, (20070305), XP002423135 [A] 14-26 * the whole document * |