EP1227377 - Method for overload protection of an actuator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.12.2004 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.02.2005 [2005/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZF Sachs AG Ernst-Sachs-Strasse 62 97424 Schweinfurt / DE | [2002/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
John, Thomas, Dipl.-Ing. Birkenstrasse 16 97529 Sulzheim / DE | 02 /
Kuhn, Thomas, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Flurstrasse 3 97688 Bad Kissingen / DE | 03 /
Romanowski, Ralf, Dipl.-Ing. Hebererstrasse 15 97422 Schweinfurt / DE | [2002/31] | Application number, filing date | 02000994.0 | 17.01.2002 | [2002/31] | Priority number, date | DE2001102520 | 20.01.2001 Original published format: DE 10102520 | EP20010129364 | 17.12.2001 Original published format: EP 01129364 | DE2002101598 | 16.01.2002 Original published format: DE 10201598 | [2002/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1227377 | Date: | 31.07.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1227377 | Date: | 17.12.2003 | [2003/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G05B9/02, G05B23/02 | [2002/31] | CPC: |
G05B23/0235 (EP);
F15B19/005 (EP);
F16D48/066 (EP);
G05B23/0291 (EP);
G05B9/02 (EP);
F16D2500/3166 (EP);
F16D2500/3168 (EP);
F16D2500/50296 (EP);
F16D2500/5106 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2004/37] |
Former [2002/31] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Schutz eines Stellantriebs vor Überlastung | [2002/31] | English: | Method for overload protection of an actuator | [2002/31] | French: | Procédé de protection d'un actionneur contre la surcharge | [2002/31] | Examination procedure | 17.06.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/06] | 08.09.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/06] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 06.08.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 06.08.2004 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2004 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4525763 (HARDY ROBERT M [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 6, line 40 - column 8, line 50 *; | [A]US4651142 (KLATT ALFRED [DE]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 36 - column 5, line 20 *; | [A]US4873606 (PANNIER GERARD [FR]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 31 - column 4, line 18 *; | [X]DE4124722 (STEYR DAIMLER PUCH AG [AT]) [X] 1 * page 2, line 29 - page 3, line 34 *; | [A]DE4134669 (FICHTEL & SACHS AG [DE]); | [A]US5796221 (CRAMER CHARLES C [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 5, line 49 - column 6, line 53 *; | [X]DE19853333 (LUK GETRIEBE SYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,8,19 * column 6, line 34 - column 9, line 4 * |