EP1225779 - Method and apparatus for measuring the transmitting time offset of a base station [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.04.2005 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.06.2005 [2005/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6 Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8010 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/30] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6 Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101-8010 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ogino, Atsushi, Hitachi, Ltd., Int. Prop. Gp. New Marunouchi Bldg., 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 02 /
Kuwahara, Mikio, Hitachi, Ltd., Int. Prop. Gp. New Marunouchi Bldg., 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 03 /
Ishifuji, Tomoaki, Hitachi, Ltd., Int. Prop. Gp. New Marunouchi Bldg., 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 04 /
Fujishima, Kenzaburo, Hitachi, Ltd., Int. Prop. Gp New Marunouchi Bldg., 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | [2002/30] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/30] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02001024.5 | 17.01.2002 | [2002/30] | Priority number, date | JP20010011658 | 19.01.2001 Original published format: JP 2001011658 | [2002/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1225779 | Date: | 24.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1225779 | Date: | 28.08.2002 | [2002/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1225779 | Date: | 16.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/38, G01S5/10 | [2002/35] | CPC: |
G01S5/10 (EP,US);
H04W56/00 (KR);
G01S19/235 (EP,US);
G01S5/021 (EP,US);
G01S5/0244 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/155 (KR);
H04W88/08 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2002/30] | H04Q7/38 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/21] |
Former [2002/30] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Apparat und Verfahren zum Messen der Verschiebung des Übertragungszeitpunktes einer Basisstation | [2002/30] | English: | Method and apparatus for measuring the transmitting time offset of a base station | [2002/30] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour mesurer le décalage du moment de transmission d'une station de base | [2002/30] | Examination procedure | 13.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/07] | 14.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9956413 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1,7 * page 2, lines 5-21 ** page 3, lines 6-11 *; | [X]WO0069198 (CELL LOC INC [CA], et al) [X] 1,7,15,14,12,13,11,8-10,6,5,4,3,2 * page 3, lines 7-11 * * page 5, lines 4-10 * * page 9, lines 6-10 * * page 46, lines 1-10 * * page 106, lines 15-20 * * page 27, lines 9-12 * * page 10, lines 10-15 * * page 9, lines 6-10 * * page 9, lines 6-10 * * page 3, lines 7-11 * * page 86, lines 5-12 * * page 27, lines 6-12 * * page 10, lines 10-15 * |