EP1211847 - Method of determining a connection between devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.07.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.08.2006 [2006/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Loran Network Systems, L.L.C. 1013 Centre Road Wilmington, DE 19505 / US | [2002/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dawes, Nicholas 99 Lyttleton Gardens Ottawa, Ontario K1L 3A4 / CA | 02 /
Schenkel, David 250-120D Rideau Place Ottawa, Ontario K1N 9N7 / CA | 03 /
Slavitch, Michael 379 Madison Avenue Ottawa, Ontario K2A 0B6 / CA | [2002/23] | Representative(s) | Rapp, Bertram, et al Charrier Rapp & Liebau Patentanwälte PartG mbB Fuggerstrasse 20 86150 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/23] | Rapp, Bertram, Dr., et al Charrier Rapp & Liebau Patentanwälte Postfach 31 02 60 86063 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 02001746.3 | 15.11.1996 | [2002/23] | Priority number, date | US19950558729 | 16.11.1995 Original published format: US 558729 | US19960599310 | 09.02.1996 Original published format: US 599310 | [2002/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1211847 | Date: | 05.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1211847 | Date: | 25.05.2005 | [2005/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/26, H04L12/24 | [2005/21] | CPC: |
H04L45/02 (EP,US);
H04L41/12 (EP,US);
H04L41/142 (EP,US);
H04L43/00 (EP,US);
H04L43/10 (EP,US);
H04L45/70 (EP,US);
H04L43/024 (EP,US);
H04L43/065 (EP,US);
H04L43/0811 (EP,US);
H04L43/0829 (EP,US);
H04L43/0882 (EP,US);
H04L43/0894 (EP,US);
H04L43/16 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2002/23] | H04L12/24 | Designated contracting states | [2006/07] |
Former [2002/23] | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Ermittlung einer Verbindung zwischen Geräten | [2002/23] | English: | Method of determining a connection between devices | [2002/23] | French: | Méthode pour déterminer une connexion entre des dispositifs | [2002/23] | Examination procedure | 23.02.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/35] | 31.03.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2006/35] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP96937951.0 / EP0861543 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.01.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2006 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 12.01.2006 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2005 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0455402 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1-3 * abstract * * column 2, line 29 - column 3, line 44 ** claims 1-10 *; | [YA] - "ROBUST METHOD FOR TRAINING SEQUENTIAL DECISION-MAKING FOR ARTIFICIAL INTELLIGENCE SYSTEMS", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, (198806), vol. 31, no. 1, pages 329 - 332, XP000049712 [Y] 1 * page 329, paragraph 2 * * page 331, paragraph 2 * * page 332, paragraph L * [A] 2,3 | [YA] - YASUDA Y ET AL, "AUTOMATED NETWORK CONNECTION TRACING AND DATA GATHERING METHODS IN THE SDH NETWORK", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, (19940201), vol. 42, no. 2/03/04, pages 1065 - 1075, XP000447371 [Y] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [000I] * * paragraph [IV.C] * [A] 2,3 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCOMM.1994.580215 |