EP1227313 - Surface plasmon resonance measuring chip and method of manufacture thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.03.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.04.2014 [2014/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2011/35] |
Former [2007/11] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states Fujinon Corporation 1-324 Uetake-cho, Kita-ku, Saitama Saitama / JP | |||
Former [2005/19] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minamiashigara-shi Kanagawa-ken, 250-01 / JP | ||
For all designated states Fujinon Corporation 1-324 Uetake-cho, Kita-ku, Saitama Saitama / JP | |||
Former [2002/31] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minamiashigara-shi Kanagawa-ken, 250-01 / JP | ||
For all designated states Fuji Photo Optical Co., Ltd. 1-324 Uetake-machi Omiya-shi Saitama-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Naya, Masayuki Fuji Photo Film Co.Ltd. 798 Miyanodai,Kaisei-machi Ashigarakami-gun, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Kubo, Takashi Fuji Photo Film Co.Ltd. 798 Miyanodai,Kaisei-machi Ashigarakami-gun, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Ito, Takashi Fuji Photo Optical Co., Ltd., 1-324 Uetake-machi Ohmiya-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 04 /
Nomura, Yoshimitsu Fuji Photo Optical Co., Ltd., 1-324 Uetake-machi Ohmiya-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | [2002/31] | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/31] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 80797 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02001783.6 | 25.01.2002 | [2002/31] | Priority number, date | JP20010016632 | 25.01.2001 Original published format: JP 2001016632 | JP20010299568 | 28.09.2001 Original published format: JP 2001299568 | [2002/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1227313 | Date: | 31.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1227313 | Date: | 19.05.2004 | [2004/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/55, G01N21/21, B29C45/56 | [2004/21] | CPC: |
G01N21/553 (EP,US);
B29C45/0025 (EP,US);
B29C2045/0027 (EP,US);
G01N2201/0415 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/31] | G01N21/55 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB, SE [2005/06] |
Former [2002/31] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Chip zur Messung durch Oberflächenplasmonenresonanz und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | [2002/31] | English: | Surface plasmon resonance measuring chip and method of manufacture thereof | [2002/31] | French: | Puce pour la mesure par resonance de plasmons de surface et procédé de fabrication associé | [2002/31] | Examination procedure | 03.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/45] | 20.11.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 14.03.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, TR | 04.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/17] | 16.12.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/17] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.02.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 28.12.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.12.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.12.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 28.12.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 28.12.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 28.12.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 28.12.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 28.12.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 28.12.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 28.12.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.12.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.12.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 28.12.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 28.12.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 28.12.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.12.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2014 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPH09257699 ; | [XY]JPH09257701 ; | [Y]JPS6283121 ; | [Y]JPH09207178 ; | [A]JP2000178317 ; | [A]JPH1129526 ; | [E]JP2002296177 ; | [A]EP0936227 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO [JP]) [A] 1-6,13 * paragraphs [0001] - [0003] - [0008] , [0010] , [0047] , [0063] , [0064] , [0085] , [0093] *; | [PX]WO0169207 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP], et al) [PX] 1-13 * Document language: Japanese (for English text see EP1186881) *; | [E]EP1186881 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1-13 * paragraphs [0092] , [0093] , [0096] , [0135] , [0170] , [0269]; figure 2 *; | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980130), vol. 1998, no. 02, & JP09257699 A 19971003 (TOTO LTD) [X] 1-12 * abstract * [Y] 13 | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980130), vol. 1998, no. 02, & JP09257701 A 19971003 (TOTO LTD) [X] 1-12 * abstract * [Y] 13 | [X] - CARR R ET AL, "Development of a surface plasmon resonance sensor for commercial applications", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS B, ELSEVIER SEQUOIA S.A., LAUSANNE, CH, (19970301), vol. 39, no. 1-3, ISSN 0925-4005, pages 375 - 379, XP004087775 [X] 1-3,7-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0925-4005(97)80237-7 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870918), vol. 011, no. 289, Database accession no. (M - 625), & JP62083121 A 19870416 (HITACHI LTD) [Y] 13 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971225), vol. 1997, no. 12, & JP09207178 A 19970812 (SHARP CORP) [Y] 13 * abstract * | [A] - NATSUUME T ET AL, "A NEW HIGH HEAT RESISTANT, HIGH CLARITY, AND HIGH HUMIDITY RESISTANT POLYMER FOR OPTICAL USES", MATERIALS RESEARCH SOCIETY SYMPOSIUM PROCEEDINGS, MATERIALS RESEARCH SOCIETY, PITTSBURG, PA, US, (19890425), vol. 150, ISSN 0272-9172, pages 245 - 250, XP009007850 [A] 1-6,13 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20001013), vol. 2000, no. 09, & JP2000178317 A 20000627 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO LTD) [A] 1-6,13 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990531), vol. 1999, no. 05, & JP11029526 A 19990202 (MITSUI CHEM INC) [A] 1-6 * abstract * | [PX] - JORGENSON R C, "A surface plasmon resonance side active retro-reflecting sensor", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS B, ELSEVIER SEQUOIA S.A., LAUSANNE, CH, (20010310), vol. 73, no. 2-3, ISSN 0925-4005, pages 236 - 248, XP004317284 [PX] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0925-4005(00)00690-0 | [E] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20030205), vol. 2003, no. 02, & JP2002296177 A 20021009 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [E] 1-12 * abstract * | Examination | US5359681 | US5606633 | JPH11344437 | DE19923820 |