EP1243357 - Material transport device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.01.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.02.2010 [2010/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aida Engineering Co., Ltd. 2-10, Ohyama-cho Sagamihara-shi Kanagawa 229-1181 / JP | [2009/11] |
Former [2002/39] | For all designated states Aida Engineering Co., Ltd. 2-10, Ohyama-cho Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa 229-1181 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arai, Toshihiko c/o Aida Engineering Co., Ltd., 2-10 Ohyama-Cho Sagimihara-Shi, Kanagawa 229-1181 / JP | 02 /
Maeda, Nobuyoshi c/o Aida Engineering Co., Ltd., 2-10 Ohyama-Cho Sagimihara-Shi, Kanagawa 229-1181 / JP | [2002/39] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/33] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/39] | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing., et al Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner GbR, TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02001791.9 | 25.01.2002 | [2002/39] | Priority number, date | JP20010077846 | 19.03.2001 Original published format: JP 2001077846 | [2002/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1243357 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1243357 | Date: | 28.04.2004 | [2004/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1243357 | Date: | 11.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B21D43/18, B65G15/58, B65G21/20, B65G47/92 | [2004/18] | CPC: |
B21D43/18 (EP,US);
B21D43/12 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/39] | B21D43/12, B21D43/18 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, IT, LI [2005/03] |
Former [2002/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Materialtransportvorrichtung | [2002/39] | English: | Material transport device | [2002/39] | French: | Dispositif de transport pour matériau | [2002/39] | Examination procedure | 04.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/41] | 08.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4912959 (BOND IRVIN D [US]) [A] 1,4 * the whole document *; | [A]DE9012050U (SIEMENS); | [A]DE19544490 (SCHULER PRESSEN GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1,4 * the whole document *; | [A]DE29915611U (NSM MAGNETTECH GMBH & CO KG [DE]) |