EP1206073 - System and method for pushing information from a host system to a mobile data communicatoin device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.09.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.10.2011 [2011/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Research In Motion Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, ON N2L 3W8 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2002/20] | For all designated states Research In Motion Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mousseau, Gary P. 493 Heatherhill Pl. Waterloo, Ontario N2T 1H7 / CA | 02 /
Lazardis, Mihal 263 Carrington Place Waterloo, Ontario N2T 2K1 / CA | [2002/20] | Representative(s) | Reichl, Wolfgang, et al MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Straße 29 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/17] | Reichl, Wolfgang, et al MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/34] | Reichl, Wolfgang Schmit Chretien Schihin & Mahler Baaderstraße 3 80469 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/13] | Jones Day Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte, Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/28] | Ricker, Mathias, Dr. Jones Day, Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte, Prinzregentenstrasse 56 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/20] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 02001801.6 | 28.05.1999 | [2002/20] | Priority number, date | US19980087623 | 29.05.1998 Original published format: US 87623 | [2002/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1206073 | Date: | 15.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1206073 | Date: | 12.11.2003 | [2003/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/28, H04L12/56, H04L29/06 | [2002/20] | CPC: |
H04W4/12 (EP,US);
H04L12/28 (KR);
G06Q10/107 (EP,US);
G06Q10/109 (EP,US);
H04L51/04 (EP,US);
H04L51/214 (EP,US);
H04L51/58 (EP,US);
H04L63/0428 (EP,US);
H04L67/04 (EP,US);
H04L67/1095 (EP,US);
H04L67/51 (EP,US);
H04L67/52 (EP,US);
H04L67/55 (EP,US);
H04L67/563 (EP,US);
H04L67/63 (EP,US);
H04L9/40 (US);
H04M3/4872 (EP,US);
H04W12/033 (EP,US);
H04W12/037 (EP,US);
H04W24/00 (EP,US);
H04W4/00 (EP,US);
H04W4/02 (EP);
H04W4/16 (EP,US);
H04W8/26 (EP,US);
H04W88/04 (EP,US);
H04L51/063 (EP,US);
H04L51/066 (EP,US);
H04L51/08 (EP,US);
H04L51/48 (EP,US);
H04L63/083 (EP,US);
H04L67/01 (US);
H04L67/02 (EP,US);
H04L67/564 (EP,US);
H04L69/329 (EP,US);
H04M2203/353 (EP,US);
H04M3/4211 (EP,US);
H04W40/00 (EP,US);
H04W8/18 (EP,US);
H04W8/245 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2004/32] |
Former [2002/20] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Schieben von Information von einem Wirtrechnersystem zu einem mobilen Datenkommunikationsgerät | [2002/20] | English: | System and method for pushing information from a host system to a mobile data communicatoin device | [2002/20] | French: | Système et procédé permettant de transferer des informations dans un dispositif de communication de données mobile à partir d'un système hôte | [2002/20] | Examination procedure | 25.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/20] | 27.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/41] | 23.05.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/41] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99922026.2 / EP1082839 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.05.2005 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2002 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   24.06.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP0788287 (AT & T CORP [US]) [Y] 5 * abstract * * column 1, line 5 - column 3, line 30 * * column 3, line 56 - column 4, line 40 * * column 6, line 18 - line 47 *[A] 1,3,4; | [XAY]WO9732251 (INTERMIND CORP [US]) [X] 1-4,7,10,16,17,57,60,62 * page 1, line 4 - page 13, line 4 * * page 16, line 31 - page 19, line 26 * * page 20, line 18 - page 23, line 25 * * page 26, line 16 - line 28 * * page 29, line 1 - page 32, line 6 * * page 36, line 7 - page 38, line 21 * * page 44, line 30 - page 46, line 10 * * page 52, line 28 - page 57, line 5 * * page 58, line 14 - line 19 * * page 61, line 27 - page 65, line 31 * * page 67, line 13 - line 22 * * page 75, line 12 - line 28 * * page 78, line 6 - page 87, line 13 * * page 89, line 26 - page 90, line 2 * * page 102, line 5 - page 104, line 1 * * page 111, line 7 - page 113, line 19 * * page 117, line 18 - page 119, line 9 * * page 120, line 31 - page 121, line 18 * * page 122, line 19 - page 123, line 21 * * page 129, line 1 - line 24 * * page 133, line 30 - page 135, line 25 * [A] 12-14,55,56 [Y] 5,6,8,9; | [XA]WO9741654 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [X] 1,2,7,10,12,16,17,57,62 * abstract * * page 1, line 2 - page 7, line 9 * * page 10, line 14 - page 11, line 5 * [A] 3,18,55,56,60; | [YA]WO9800787 (DATALINK SYSTEMS CORP [US]) [Y] 5,6,8,9 * abstract * * page 1, line 9 - page 3, line 13 * * page 4, line 22 - page 5, line 27 * * page 6, line 1 - page 8, line 4 * [A] 1,3,4,55-57,60,62; | [XA]US5742905 (PEPE DAVID MATTHEW [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7,10,12,16-23 * column 4, line 31 - column 11, line 54 * * column 21, line 64 - column 22, line 62 * * column 23, line 11 - line 49 * * column 25, line 8 - line 50 * * column 26, line 66 - column 27, line 7 * * column 29, line 65 - column 30, line 13 * * column 31, line 47 - line 65 * [A] 3,55-57,60,62; | [XA]WO9821911 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1,10,13,14,55,56 * abstract * * page 1, line 3 - page 4, line 3 * * page 4, line 29 - page 7, line 12 * * page 8, line 9 - line 18 * * page 9, line 3 - line 29 * * page 10, line 6 - line 13 * * claims 16,20,25 * [A] 2,3,7,12,16,17,57,60,62 |