EP1227627 - Method and system for controlling a communication network and router used in the network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/31] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Karino, Shuichi NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Mizukoshi, Yasuhiro NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2002/31] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/31] | Glawe. Delfs. Moll Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02001887.5 | 28.01.2002 | [2002/31] | Priority number, date | JP20010018589 | 26.01.2001 Original published format: JP 2001018589 | JP20010027048 | 02.02.2001 Original published format: JP 2001027048 | JP20010020198 | 29.01.2001 Original published format: JP 2001020198 | [2002/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1227627 | Date: | 31.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1227627 | Date: | 16.10.2002 | [2002/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1227627 | Date: | 05.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/56, H04L12/18, H04L29/06 | [2002/31] | CPC: |
H04L12/185 (EP,US);
H04W28/10 (US);
H04L41/0668 (US);
H04L45/00 (US);
H04L45/02 (EP,US);
H04L45/04 (EP,US);
H04L45/16 (EP,US);
H04L45/20 (EP,US);
H04L45/22 (EP,US);
H04L45/28 (EP,US);
H04L45/583 (EP,US);
H04L45/586 (EP,US);
H04W36/02 (EP,US);
H04W40/24 (EP,US);
H04W72/0446 (US);
H04L12/1854 (EP,US);
H04L12/189 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13098 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13141 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13374 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13383 (EP,US);
H04W40/20 (EP,US);
H04W40/246 (EP,US);
H04W40/248 (EP,US);
H04W40/36 (EP,US);
H04W76/10 (EP,US);
H04W8/08 (EP,US);
H04W8/26 (EP,US);
H04W80/00 (EP,US);
H04W80/04 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/28] |
Former [2002/31] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zum Steuern eines Kommunikationsnetzes und eines im Netz angewandten Routers | [2002/31] | English: | Method and system for controlling a communication network and router used in the network | [2002/31] | French: | Methode et système pour contrôler un réseau de communication et un routeur utilisé dans le réseau | [2002/31] | Examination procedure | 03.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/45] | 06.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP02021483.9 / EP1278341 | EP02021486.2 / EP1278342 | Opposition(s) | 06.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5793978 (FOWLER GREGORY ALAN [US]) [Y] 1-21 * column 1, line 25 - line 36 * * column 3, line 31 - line 40 * * abstract *; | [Y]WO0072485 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [Y] 1-21 * page 8, line 14 - line 25 * * page 5, line 3 - page 6, line 16 * * figure 3 * * figure 5 *; | [A] - AZCORRA A ET AL, "MULTICAST CONGESTION CONTROL FOR ACTIVE NETWORK SERVICES", EUROPEAN TRANSACTIONS ON TELECOMMUNICATIONS, EUREL PUBLICATION, MILANO, IT, (199905), vol. 10, no. 3, ISSN 1124-318X, pages 309 - 317, XP000860642 [A] * page 311, paragraph 3 * |