EP1229476 - Method and system for securely distributing computer software products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 26.05.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 28.06.2017 [2017/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc. 919 East Hillsdale Boulevard, 2nd Floor Foster City, CA 94404-2175 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/32] | For all designated states Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc. 919 East Hillsdale Boulevard, 2nd Floor Foster City, CA 94404-2175 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chatani, Masayuki, Sony Computer Entertainment America, Inc., 919, East Hillsdale Blvd., 2nd Fl. Foster City, California 94404-2175 / US | 02 /
Mallinson, Dominic Saul, Sony Computer Entert. America, Inc., 919, East Hillsdale Blvd., 2nd Fl. Foster City, California 94404-2175 / US | [2002/32] | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/32] | Müller - Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte, Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02001913.9 | 31.01.2002 | [2002/32] | Priority number, date | US20010773716 | 31.01.2001 Original published format: US 773716 | [2002/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1229476 | Date: | 07.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1229476 | Date: | 28.08.2002 | [2002/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60, G07F7/10, G06F1/00 | [2002/32] | CPC: |
G06F21/10 (EP,US);
G06F17/00 (KR);
G06F21/00 (KR);
G06Q20/382 (EP,US);
G06Q30/02 (EP,US);
G06F2221/2137 (EP,US);
Y04S40/20 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2003/21] |
Former [2002/32] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zum sicheren Verteilen von Computer-Software-Produkten | [2002/32] | English: | Method and system for securely distributing computer software products | [2002/32] | French: | Méthode et système pour la distribution protégée de produits logiciels d'ordinateur | [2002/32] | Examination procedure | 06.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/15] | 12.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/26] | 13.12.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.02.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/26] | 07.02.2017 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.03.2003 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 27.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5222134 (WAITE DAVID P [US], et al) [X] 48-53 * abstract * * column 2, line 13 - column 3, line 13 * [A] 1-47; | [XA]US5490216 (RICHARDSON III FREDERIC B [AU]) [X] 48-53 * figures 1,2A-2C *[A] 1-47; | [X]EP0795809 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 1-53 * abstract * * column 4, line 55 - column 6, line 44 * |