EP1228717 - Antimicrobial and deodorant cosmetic brush and method of producing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.10.2009 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nakamura, Kenji Taiki Awaji Factory Co., Ltd. 3-41, Nishi Awaji 6-chome Higashi Yodogawa-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | For all designated states Nakamura, Koji Taiki Awaji Factory Co., Ltd. 3-41, Nishi Awaji 6-chome Higashi Yodogawa-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/49] | For all designated states Nakamura, Kenji Taiki Awaji Factory Co., Ltd. 3-41, Nishi Awaji 6-chome Higashi Yodogawa-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | ||
For all designated states Nakamura, Koji Taiki Awaji Factory Co., Ltd. 3-41, Nishi Awaji 6-chome Higashi Yodogawa-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | |||
Former [2002/32] | For all designated states Kenji, Nakamura, Taiki Awaji Factory Co., Ltd. 3-41, Nishi Awaji 6-chome, Higashi, Yodowaga-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | ||
For all designated states Nakamura, Kohji, Taiki Awaji Factory Co., Ltd. 3-41, Nishi Awaji 6-chome, Higashi, Yodogawa-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/32] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/32] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02002019.4 | 06.02.2002 | [2002/32] | Priority number, date | JP20010029734 | 06.02.2001 Original published format: JP 2001029734 | [2002/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1228717 | Date: | 07.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1228717 | Date: | 09.07.2003 | [2003/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1228717 | Date: | 03.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A46D1/00, A46D1/04, A46D9/06 | [2003/28] | CPC: |
A46D9/06 (EP,US);
A46D1/006 (EP,US);
A46B2200/1046 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2933 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/32] | A46D1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/32] | Title | German: | Antimikrobielle und desodorierende Kosmetikbürste und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | [2008/42] | English: | Antimicrobial and deodorant cosmetic brush and method of producing the same | [2002/32] | French: | Brosse cosmétique antimicrobienne et désodorisante et procédé de sa fabrication | [2008/42] |
Former [2002/32] | Antimikrobielle und desodorierende Kosmetikbürste und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | ||
Former [2002/32] | Brosse cosmétique antimicrobienne et désodorisante et procédé de fabrication | Examination procedure | 22.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/10] | 28.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 02.09.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.12.2008 | BE | 03.12.2008 | CY | 03.12.2008 | DK | 03.12.2008 | FI | 03.12.2008 | NL | 03.12.2008 | TR | 03.12.2008 | IE | 06.02.2009 | LU | 06.02.2009 | CH | 28.02.2009 | LI | 28.02.2009 | MC | 28.02.2009 | SE | 03.03.2009 | GR | 04.03.2009 | ES | 14.03.2009 | PT | 04.05.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/21] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
IE | 06.02.2009 | ||
LU | 06.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
GR | 04.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/47] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
IE | 06.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
GR | 04.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
IE | 06.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/42] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/40] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/37] | BE | 03.12.2008 | |
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | BE | 03.12.2008 | |
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/25] | FI | 03.12.2008 | |
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | ES | 14.03.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2055322 (KEDZIE TELLER W) [Y] 5 * column 2, line 7 - line 29 *; | [A]US4594242 (NAGANUMA TAKESHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-8* the whole document *; | [A]US4708870 (PARDINI STEVEN P [US]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0286741 (DOW CORNING [US], et al) [X] 1,3,6,7 * claim - *; | [XY]US5405644 (OHSUMI SHUICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,6-8 * column 2, line 34 - line 35 * * column 5, line 3 - line 36 * [Y] 2,4,5; | [Y]JPH1143866 (BROTHER IND LTD) [Y] 2,4 * abstract *; | [X]US5976193 (THOMAS SHERRIE L [US], et al) [X] 1,3,8 * column 1, line 30 - line 39 * * column 6, line 29 - line 44 * | by applicant | JPS4827389 | JPS4831719 | JPS5040688 | JPS53128451 | JPH02274205 | JPH03289905 | JPH057510 |