EP1231125 - Mobile sitting device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.2007 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 12.09.2007 [2007/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WANZL METALLWARENFABRIK GMBH Postfach 1129 D-89336 Leipheim / DE | [2002/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Scheffler, Hans Friedhofstrasse 1/1 89233 Neu-Ulm/Burlafingen / DE | [2002/33] | Application number, filing date | 02002343.8 | 31.01.2002 | [2002/33] | Priority number, date | DE2001202066U | 07.02.2001 Original published format: DE 20102066 U | DE2001109923 | 01.03.2001 Original published format: DE 10109923 | [2002/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1231125 | Date: | 14.08.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1231125 | Date: | 03.12.2003 | [2003/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1231125 | Date: | 19.04.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B62B7/04, B62B13/14, B62B7/00, B62B9/26 | [2003/49] | CPC: |
B62B9/26 (EP);
B62B7/008 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/33] | B62B7/04, B62B13/14 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/35] |
Former [2002/33] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Fahrbare Sitzeinrichtung | [2002/33] | English: | Mobile sitting device | [2002/33] | French: | Dispositif de siège mobile | [2002/33] | Examination procedure | 16.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/09] | 04.06.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.09.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 04.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.07.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.07.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.07.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 08.07.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 08.07.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.07.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 08.07.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.07.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.07.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.07.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 08.07.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 08.07.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.07.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.07.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2005 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   29.07.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 19.04.2006 | ES | 30.07.2006 | [2007/37] |
Former [2006/50] | ES | 30.07.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2443236 (GALLAGHER PAUL C) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]US4381870 (MUELLNER JAMES M) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]US5354079 (HETTENBACH STEPHEN [US]); | [A]EP0995662 (EVENFLO CO INC [US]) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]US6161848 (BEUMER STEPHANUS THEODORUS ANT [NL], et al) |