EP1230974 - Catalytic reactor with U-Tubes for improved heat transfer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.10.2003 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.12.2003 [2003/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ballard Generation Systems Inc. 4242 Phillips Avenue, Unit C Burnaby, B.C. V5A 2X2 / CA | [2002/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chong, Patricia, S. 2106-6837 Station Hill Drive Burnaby, British Columbia V3N 5B7 / CA | 02 /
Sterenberg, David, J. 527 East 31st Avenue Vancouver, British Columbia V5A 2W7 / CA | 03 /
Kutty, Jitesh 3460 Edgemount Boulevard, North Vancouver British Columbia V7R 2P5 / CA | 04 /
Berkley, Jeffrey A. 1567 Eagle Run Drive Brackendale, British Columbia VON 2X2 / CA | 05 /
Bogacki, Andrzej, W. 5 Noble Court Port Moody, British Columbia V3H 3Z5 / CA | [2002/33] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB Postfach 10 40 36 70035 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/33] | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner Postfach 10 40 36 70035 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 02002527.6 | 04.02.2002 | [2002/33] | Priority number, date | US20010781018 | 08.02.2001 Original published format: US 781018 | [2002/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1230974 | Date: | 14.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B01J8/02, B01J8/04, C01B3/16, C01B3/58, H01M8/06 | [2002/33] | CPC: |
H01M8/0662 (EP,US);
B01J8/025 (EP,US);
B01J8/0257 (EP,US);
B01J8/0285 (EP,US);
B01J8/0461 (EP,US);
B01J8/0496 (EP,US);
C01B3/16 (EP,US);
C01B3/583 (EP,US);
B01J2208/00132 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2003/19] |
Former [2002/33] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Katalytischer Reaktor mit U-Rohren für verbesserte Wärmeleitung | [2002/33] | English: | Catalytic reactor with U-Tubes for improved heat transfer | [2002/33] | French: | Réacteur catalytique comportant des tubes en U pour améliorer le transfert thermique | [2002/33] | Examination procedure | 15.02.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/49] | 04.07.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/49] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 28.03.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2003 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 28.03.2003 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2219214 (WILSON DUSTIN W, et al) [X] 1 * page 1, column L, line 1 - line 12 * * page 2, column L, line 8 - line 40; figure 1 * * page 1, column L, line 36 - column R, line 4 * * page 1 *; | [X]US2744813 (HERBERT PAUL) [X] 1,8,9 * column 1, line 15 - line 56 * * column 2, line 39 - line 47 * * column 4, line 3 - line 16 * * figure 1 *; | [X]DE3007203 (LINDE AG [DE]) [X] 1 * page 3, line 15 - line 19 * * page 7, line 19 - line 30 * * figure 2; claims 1,8 *; | [X]US4420462 (CLYDE ROBERT A [US]) [X] 1,8,9 * abstract * * column 1, line 62 - column 2, line 53 * * column 3, line 12 - column 4, line 60 * * column 5, line 15 - line 20; figure - *; | [X]EP0539834 (OTTO OEKO TECH [DE]) [X] 1-5,8,9,13 * abstract * * column 2, line 31 - line 39 * * column 5, line 17 - line 35; figure 2B *; | [A]DE4142402 (LINDE AG [DE]) [A] * abstract *; | [A]WO9936351 (LITTLE INC A [US]) [A] * abstract * * page 3, line 22 - line 27 * * page 7, line 21 - line 25 * * page 12, line 16 - page 14, line 2 * * figure 1 * |