EP1234957 - Valve drive in an internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GE Jenbacher GmbH & Co OHG Achenseestrasse 1-3 6200 Jenbach / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2004/12] | For all designated states GE Jenbacher GmbH & Co. OHG Achenseestrasse 1-3 6200 Jenbach / AT | ||
Former [2002/35] | For all designated states Jenbacher Aktiengesellschaft Achenseestrasse 1-3 6200 Jenbach / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Laiminger, Stephan Oberndorf 141 6322 Kirchbichl / AT | [2002/35] | Representative(s) | Torggler, Paul Norbert, et al Torggler & Hofinger Patentanwälte Wilhelm-Greil-Strasse 16 6020 Innsbruck / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2002/35] | Torggler, Paul Norbert, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Torggler & Hofinger Wilhelm-Greil-Strasse 16 Postfach 556 6021 Innsbruck / AT | Application number, filing date | 02002529.2 | 04.02.2002 | [2002/35] | Priority number, date | AT20010000268 | 21.02.2001 Original published format: AT 2682001 | [2002/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1234957 | Date: | 28.08.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1234957 | Date: | 08.01.2003 | [2003/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1234957 | Date: | 31.03.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F01L9/02, F01L1/24 | [2003/02] | CPC: |
F01L9/11 (EP);
F01L1/08 (EP);
F01L2001/34446 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/35] | F01L9/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/35] | Title | German: | Ventiltrieb für eine Brennkraftmaschine | [2002/35] | English: | Valve drive in an internal combustion engine | [2002/35] | French: | Commande de soupape pour moteur à combustion interne | [2002/35] | Examination procedure | 16.06.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/33] | 01.09.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IE | 31.03.2004 | TR | 31.03.2004 | DK | 30.06.2004 | GR | 30.06.2004 | SE | 30.06.2004 | PT | 31.08.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2006/52] | IE | 31.03.2004 | |
TR | 31.03.2004 | ||
DK | 30.06.2004 | ||
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
SE | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/19] | IE | 31.03.2004 | |
DK | 30.06.2004 | ||
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
SE | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | DK | 30.06.2004 | |
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
SE | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | GR | 30.06.2004 | |
SE | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | SE | 30.06.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE1018880 (ALBERT POMUTZ) [Y] 1,2 * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 43; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [YA]EP0024994 (SEMT [FR]) [Y] 5 * page 10, line 11 - page 10, line 27 * * page 11, line 6 - page 12, line 15 * * page 19, line 9 - page 19, line 17 * [A] 3; | [A]DE4111610 (AUDI AG [DE]) [A] 1 * column W *; | [A]US5163389 (FUJIKAWA TORU [JP], et al) [A] 1,3,4 * column 1, line 13 - column 1, line 24; figures 1,2 ** column 2, line 40 - column 2, line 61 *; | [DY]DE4124184 (SCHAEFFLER WAELZLAGER KG [DE]) [DY] 1,2,5 * column W *; | [A]DE19653459 (SCHAEFFLER WAELZLAGER OHG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 28 - column 4, line 65; figures 1,2; claim 1 * | by applicant | DE4124184 |