EP1333105 - Process for heat treating metallic articles and heat treated article [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/32] | Process and apparatus for heat treating metallic articles and heat treated article | ||
[2007/35] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.2009 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 26.10.2011 [2011/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ipsen International GmbH Flutstrasse 78 47533 Kleve / DE | [2003/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Edenhofer, Bernd Hölderlinstrasse 29 47533 Kleve / DE | [2003/32] | Representative(s) | Brinkmann & Partner Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Am Seestern 8 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/32] | Stenger, Watzke & Ring Patentanwälte Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 70 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 02002530.0 | 04.02.2002 | [2003/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1333105 | Date: | 06.08.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1333105 | Date: | 02.04.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C23C8/34 | [2003/32] | CPC: |
C21D9/0062 (EP,US);
C23C8/34 (EP,US);
F27B5/04 (EP,US);
F27B5/12 (EP,US);
F27B5/13 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/32] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Wärmebehandlung metallischer Werkstücke sowie wärmebehandeltes Werkstück | [2007/35] | English: | Process for heat treating metallic articles and heat treated article | [2007/35] | French: | Procédé pour le traitement thermique d'articles métalliques et article traité thermiquement | [2007/35] |
Former [2003/32] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Wärmebehandlung metallischer Werkstücke sowie wärmebehandeltes Werkstück | ||
Former [2003/32] | Process and apparatus for heat treating metallic articles and heat treated article | ||
Former [2003/32] | Procédé et installation pour le traitement thermiques d'articles métalliques et article traité thermiquement | Examination procedure | 02.08.2002 | Examination requested [2003/32] | 02.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 02.04.2008 | DK | 02.04.2008 | FI | 02.04.2008 | IE | 02.04.2008 | TR | 02.04.2008 | SE | 02.07.2008 | GR | 03.07.2008 | ES | 13.07.2008 | PT | 02.09.2008 | [2011/43] |
Former [2010/47] | CY | 02.04.2008 | |
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
IE | 02.04.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
GR | 03.07.2008 | ||
ES | 13.07.2008 | ||
PT | 02.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/42] | CY | 02.04.2008 | |
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
IE | 02.04.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
ES | 13.07.2008 | ||
PT | 02.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | DK | 02.04.2008 | |
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
IE | 02.04.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
ES | 13.07.2008 | ||
PT | 02.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | FI | 02.04.2008 | |
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
ES | 13.07.2008 | ||
PT | 02.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | FI | 02.04.2008 | |
ES | 13.07.2008 | ||
PT | 02.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/47] | ES | 13.07.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH08144039 ; | [A]JPS62127459 ; | [A]JPH0339460 ; | [A]JPH02298251 ; | JPS4930620B [ ] (NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD.); | [A]US4806175 (WENDT ULRICH [DE]) [A] 1,19 * claims 1,2,5,6 *; | [A]EP1078996 (ABB ALSTOM POWER CH AG [CH]) [A] 1 * page 4, column 5, line 11 - line 52 *; | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961031), vol. 1996, no. 10, & JP08144039 A 19960604 (HITACHI METALS LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - KONDO, TAKAO ET AL, "Surface hardening treatment", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 83:135713 CA, URL: STN, XP002204293 [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19871120), vol. 011, no. 357, Database accession no. (C - 458), & JP62127459 A 19870609 (KAWASAKI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910502), vol. 015, no. 173, Database accession no. (C - 0828), & JP03039460 A 19910220 (SUMITOMO METAL IND LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910220), vol. 015, no. 072, Database accession no. (C - 0808), & JP02298251 A 19901210 (KOMATSU LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |