EP1232900 - Apparatus and method for controlling a four-wheel drive vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.10.2010 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fuji Jukogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 7-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [2009/51] |
Former [2002/34] | For all designated states FUJI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 7-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sakakiyama, Ryuzo, Fuji Jukogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 7-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2002/34] | Representative(s) | Popp, Eugen, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 47 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/34] | Popp, Eugen, Dr., et al MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Widenmayerstrasse 48 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02002904.7 | 08.02.2002 | [2002/34] | Priority number, date | JP20010032695 | 08.02.2001 Original published format: JP 2001032695 | [2002/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1232900 | Date: | 21.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1232900 | Date: | 05.10.2005 | [2005/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1232900 | Date: | 16.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B60K23/08, B60K28/16 | [2002/34] | CPC: |
B60K23/0808 (EP,US);
B60K23/08 (EP,US);
B60K28/16 (EP);
B60K28/165 (EP,US);
B60T8/175 (EP,US);
B60K17/344 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE [2006/24] |
Former [2002/34] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Steuern eines Fahrzeugs mit Allradantrieb | [2002/34] | English: | Apparatus and method for controlling a four-wheel drive vehicle | [2002/34] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de commande pour véhicule à quatre roues motrices | [2002/34] | Examination procedure | 14.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/02] | 21.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.04.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 31.07.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 18.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 29.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.05.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0314452 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1-16 * column 5, line 34 - line 45 * * column 9, line 8 - line 17; figures 3a,4a *; | [A]EP0231665 (AISIN-WARNER ET AL.) [A] 1-6,9-14 * figure 8; claim 1 *; | [A]US5332060 (SPERDUTI DAVID [US], et al) [A] 1-6,9-14 * column 9, line 44 - line 63; figures 5,7 *; | [A]US5737714 (MATSUNO KOJI [JP], et al) [A] 1,8,9,16* figure 5 *; | [A]US5947224 (KOUNO KAZUYUKI [JP]) [A] 1-3,5,9-11,13 * column 13, line 50 - column 14, line 5 * | by applicant | JPH01266049 |