EP1321446 - Method of forming a layered structure on a substrate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.03.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.04.2017 [2017/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOLARWATT GmbH Maria-Reich-Strass 2a 01109 Dresden / DE | [2014/21] |
Former [2010/01] | For all designated states SCHOTT Solar AG Hattenbergstrasse 10 55122 Mainz / DE | ||
Former [2008/09] | For all designated states SCHOTT Solar GmbH Carl-Zeiss-Strasse 4 63755 Alzenau / DE | ||
Former [2004/18] | For all designated states RWE Schott Solar GmbH Industriestrasse 13 63755 Alzenau / DE | ||
Former [2003/26] | For all designated states RWE Solar GmbH Industriestrasse 13 63755 Alzenau / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schwirtlich, Ingo, Physiker Josef-Wirth-Strasse 36 63897 Miltenberg / DE | 02 /
Schmidt, Wilfried, Physiker Heinrich-Schütz-Strasse 7 74193 Schwaigern / DE | 03 /
von Campe, Hilmar, Physiker Jakob-Lengfelder-Strasse 19 61352 Bad Homburg / DE | [2003/26] | Representative(s) | Stoffregen, Hans-Herbert Patentanwalt Postfach 21 44 63411 Hanau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/26] | Stoffregen, Hans-Herbert, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwalt Postfach 21 44 63411 Hanau / DE | Application number, filing date | 02003042.5 | 12.02.2002 | [2003/26] | Priority number, date | DE2001163100 | 20.12.2001 Original published format: DE 10163100 | [2003/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1321446 | Date: | 25.06.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C04B37/00, B32B18/00, H01L31/042 | [2003/26] | CPC: |
H01L31/0392 (EP);
C23C18/1208 (EP);
C23C18/1283 (EP);
H01L31/0481 (EP);
H01L31/1804 (EP);
Y02E10/547 (EP);
Y02P70/50 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2004/12] |
Former [2003/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Ausbilden einer Schichtstruktur auf einem Substrat | [2003/26] | English: | Method of forming a layered structure on a substrate | [2003/26] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d une structure stratifiée sur un substrat | [2003/26] | Examination procedure | 03.07.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/36] | 30.12.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.06.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 20.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/16] | 08.12.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/16] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.07.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 21.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 11.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 23.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 03.03.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.03.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.03.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 03.03.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 03.03.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 03.03.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 03.03.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 03.03.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 03.03.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 03.03.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.03.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 03.03.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 03.03.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 03.03.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.03.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.03.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2014 | 13   M06   Fee paid on   11.08.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA] - A. EYER ET AL., "Crystalline silicon thin-film (CSiTF) solar cells on SSP and on ceramic substrates", JOURNAL OF CRYSTAL GROWTH, Netherlands, (200105), vol. 225, no. 2-4, pages 340 - 347, XP002232906 [X] 20-22 * abstract * [A] 1-19 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-0248(01)00907-1 | [XA] - VAN ROOSMALEN J A M ET AL, "Ceramic substrates for thin-film crystalline silicon solar cells", IEEE, 25TH PVSC, New York, NY, USA, (1996), pages 657 - 660, XP010208237 [X] 20-22 * abstract * * page 657, column 2, paragraph 3 * [A] 1-19 | Examination | US5421909 | DE19744197 | EP1247587 | by applicant | US4193821 | JPS59182577 | US5151386 |