EP1337065 - Semi-reliable ARQ method and device thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.10.2004 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/19] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 16483 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2003/34] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (Publ) 126 25 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ludwig, Reiner Maubacher Strasse 4 52393 Hürtgenwald / DE | 02 /
Meyer, Michael Grossheidstrasse 27 52080 Aachen / DE | 03 /
Sachs, Joachim An den Finkenweiden 43 52074 Aachen / DE | 04 /
Wager, Stefan Möschepfad 12 52134 Herzogenrath / DE | [2003/34] | Representative(s) | Tonscheidt, Andreas Ericsson GmbH Ericsson Allee 1 52134 Herzogenrath / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Tonscheidt, Andreas Ericsson GmbH Ericsson Allee 1 52134 Herzogenrath / DE | ||
Former [2003/47] | Tonscheidt, Andreas Ericsson Eurolab Deutschland GmbH Patent Department Ericsson Allee 1 52134 Herzogenrath / DE | ||
Former [2003/34] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02003111.8 | 13.02.2002 | [2003/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1337065 | Date: | 20.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/18 | [2003/34] | CPC: |
H04L1/1838 (EP,US);
H04L1/1809 (EP,US);
H04L1/188 (EP,US);
H04L2001/0098 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2004/20] |
Former [2003/34] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Halb-zuverlässiges ARQ Verfahren und entsprechende Einrichtung | [2003/34] | English: | Semi-reliable ARQ method and device thereof | [2003/34] | French: | Procédé ARQ semi-fiable et dispositif correspondant | [2003/34] | Examination procedure | 21.02.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/47] | 15.06.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/47] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 30.03.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 30.03.2004 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2004 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0060799 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1-26 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0115373 (PHILIPS SEMICONDUCTORS INC [US]) [A] 1-26 * abstract ** page 5, line 3 - page 7, line 6 * |