EP1233325 - Terminal device and real-time clock control method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 04.04.2008 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/34] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Masatoshi, Yano NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2002/34] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/34] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02003122.5 | 13.02.2002 | [2002/34] | Priority number, date | JP20010040206 | 16.02.2001 Original published format: JP 2001040206 | [2002/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1233325 | Date: | 21.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1233325 | Date: | 21.09.2005 | [2005/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/04, G06F1/14 | [2005/38] | CPC: |
G06F1/14 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/34] | G06F1/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2006/23] |
Former [2002/34] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Terminalvorrichtung und Verfahren zur Steuerung einer Echtzeituhr | [2002/34] | English: | Terminal device and real-time clock control method | [2002/34] | French: | Appareil terminal et méthode de commande d'horloge en temps réel | [2002/34] | Examination procedure | 11.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/41] | 02.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2007 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2008/19] | 27.11.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.12.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2008/19] | 20.12.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2008 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2000227485 ; | [X]JPH11194851 ; | [X]US5216357 (COPPOLA RICHARD [US], et al) [X] 1,11 * figure 2 * * figure 5 * * column 1, lines 11-14 * * column 5, lines 21,22 * * column 5, lines 24,25 * * column 5, lines 61-68 * * column 6, lines 1-3 * * column 6, lines 15-19 * * column 6, lines 28-39 * * column 8, lines 61-63 *; | [A]EP0726508 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [A] 1,2 * column 1, lines 3-5 ** column 1, lines 51,52 *; | [A]GB2323455 (TRAFFORD LIMITED [GB]) [A] 1,2 * page 4, line 7 - page 7, line 15 *; | [A]US6085331 (YEH KUA-CHI [TW], et al) [A] 1,2 * figure 1 * * column 1, lines 10-13 * * column 1, lines 58-67 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010103), vol. 2000, no. 11, & JP2000227485 A 20000815 (SONY CORP) [X] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0036] , [0037] , [0040] , [0044] , [0046] , [0053] , [0059]; figures 3,4 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19991029), vol. 1999, no. 12, & JP11194851 A 19990721 (NEC SHIZUOKA LTD) [X] 1-5,8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0009] , [0017] , [0018] , [0021] , [0023]; figure 1 * | Examination | GB2322207 |