EP1237173 - Miniature fuse of surface-mount type [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.03.2006 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.04.2006 [2006/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOC CORPORATION 16-17, Takanawa 3-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2002/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arikawa, Hiroo 1-14-9, Oyamadai, Setagaya-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Ishimura, Koh SOC CORPORATION, Tochigi Factory 1-70, Hiruta Yuzukami-mura, Nasu-gun, Tochigi-ken / JP | 03 /
Norisue, Seiji SOC CORPORATION, Tochigi Factory 1-70, Hiruta Yuzukami-mura, Nasu-gun, Tochigi-ken / JP | [2002/36] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/36] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel Möhlstrasse 37 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02003339.5 | 13.02.2002 | [2002/36] | Priority number, date | JP20010039279 | 16.02.2001 Original published format: JP 2001039279 | JP20010370902 | 05.12.2001 Original published format: JP 2001370902 | [2002/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1237173 | Date: | 04.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1237173 | Date: | 05.03.2003 | [2003/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1237173 | Date: | 27.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01H85/041, H01H85/06, H01H85/157, H01H85/175, H01H85/18 | [2002/36] | CPC: |
H01H85/157 (EP,US);
H01H85/0418 (EP,US);
H01H85/06 (EP,US);
H01H85/1755 (EP,US);
H01H85/185 (EP,US);
H01H2085/0414 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2003/48] |
Former [2002/36] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Oberflächenmontierbare Miniatursicherung | [2002/36] | English: | Miniature fuse of surface-mount type | [2002/36] | French: | Fusible miniature à montage de surface | [2002/36] | Examination procedure | 24.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/26] | 07.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 26.01.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE364719 (JOSEF GOETTE) [X] 6* the whole document *; | [A]US4057774 (ARIKAWA HIROO, et al) [A] 1,8 * the whole document *; | [A]US4122426 (MARUO MASAYA) [A] 1,7 * the whole document *; | [A]US4297666 (ASDOLLAHI NASROLLAH) [A] 1,7 * the whole document *; | [X]US4646053 (MOSESIAN JERRY L [US]) [X] 4 * column 3, line 40 - line 45 * * column 4, line 27 - line 30 * * figures 1-4 *; | [X]DE9407550U (WICKMANN WERKE GMBH [DE]) [X] 5 * the whole document * |