EP1236835 - Injection tube for sealing building joints [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.02.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states StekoX GmbH Markgröninger Strasse 55/1 71701 Schwieberdingen / DE | [2004/15] |
Former [2002/36] | For all designated states Stekox GmbH Markgröninger Strasse 55/1 71701 Schwieberdingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | 02 /
* * * | [2002/36] | Representative(s) | Maser, Jochen Patentanwälte Mammel & Maser Tilsiter Strasse 3 71065 Sindelfingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/36] | Maser, Jochen, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Mammel & Maser, Tilsiter Strasse 3 71065 Sindelfingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 02003547.3 | 15.02.2002 | [2002/36] | Priority number, date | DE2001107745 | 16.02.2001 Original published format: DE 10107745 | DE2001139351 | 17.08.2001 Original published format: DE 10139351 | [2002/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1236835 | Date: | 04.09.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1236835 | Date: | 07.04.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/68 | [2002/36] | CPC: |
E04B1/6816 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/36] | Title | German: | Verpressschlauch zum Abdichten von Bauwerksfugen | [2002/36] | English: | Injection tube for sealing building joints | [2002/36] | French: | Tube d'injection pour sceller des liaisons structurelles | [2004/01] |
Former [2002/36] | Tube d'injection pour scheller des liaisons structurelles | Examination procedure | 04.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/18] | 09.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 07.04.2004 | IE | 07.04.2004 | TR | 07.04.2004 | DK | 07.07.2004 | GR | 07.07.2004 | SE | 07.07.2004 | ES | 18.07.2004 | PT | 07.09.2004 | [2015/21] |
Former [2008/03] | FI | 07.04.2004 | |
IE | 07.04.2004 | ||
TR | 07.04.2004 | ||
DK | 07.07.2004 | ||
GR | 07.07.2004 | ||
SE | 07.07.2004 | ||
ES | 18.07.2004 | ||
PT | 07.09.2004 | ||
Former [2006/52] | FI | 07.04.2004 | |
IE | 07.04.2004 | ||
TR | 07.04.2004 | ||
DK | 07.07.2004 | ||
GR | 07.07.2004 | ||
SE | 07.07.2004 | ||
ES | 18.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/19] | FI | 07.04.2004 | |
IE | 07.04.2004 | ||
DK | 07.07.2004 | ||
GR | 07.07.2004 | ||
SE | 07.07.2004 | ||
ES | 18.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | FI | 07.04.2004 | |
DK | 07.07.2004 | ||
GR | 07.07.2004 | ||
SE | 07.07.2004 | ||
ES | 18.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/06] | FI | 07.04.2004 | |
GR | 07.07.2004 | ||
SE | 07.07.2004 | ||
ES | 18.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 07.04.2004 | |
SE | 07.07.2004 | ||
ES | 18.07.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | SE | 07.07.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3400654 (KOOB KUNIBERT ING GRAD) [A] 1-26 * figure 1; claims 1,5 *; | [A]US5290045 (TERAUCHI MICHIYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-26 * figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [A]DE9116922U (HIENDL HERIBERT [DE]) [A] 16 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0646681 (SANDOZ LTD [CH], et al) [A] 6 * figure 1 *; | [A]WO9511352 (SEM BJARNE [NO]) [A] 25* figure 1 *; | [A]DE19609902 (MUELLER WERNER [DE]) [A] 1-26 * figure 1; claim 1 * |