EP1232969 - Device for equally spacing containers, in particular bottles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.03.2008 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PROCOMAC S.p.A. Via Fedolfi, 29 43038 Sala Baganza / IT | [2007/17] |
Former [2006/45] | For all designated states Procomac RN S.r.l. Frazione Cerasolo Ausa Via Ausa, 104 47852 Coriano / IT | ||
Former [2002/34] | For all designated states Vicini, Vittorio Via delle Ortolane, 1 47023 Cesena / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vicini, Vittorio Via delle Ortolane, 1 47023 Cesena / IT | [2006/45] |
Former [2002/34] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Gotra, Stefano, et al BUGNION S.p.A. Largo Michele Novaro, 1/A 43121 Parma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2006/37] | Gotra, Stefano, et al BUGNION S.p.A. Largo Michele Novaro, 1/A 43100 Parma / IT | ||
Former [2002/34] | Bongiovanni, Simone (IT), et al Studio Torta S.r.l Via Viotti 9 I-10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 02003664.6 | 18.02.2002 | [2002/34] | Priority number, date | IT2001BO00093 | 20.02.2001 Original published format: IT BO010093 | [2002/34] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1232969 | Date: | 21.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1232969 | Date: | 09.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B65G47/28 | [2002/34] | CPC: |
B65G23/30 (EP);
B65G47/28 (EP);
B65G47/841 (EP);
B65G47/847 (EP);
B65G2201/0244 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR [2003/20] |
Former [2002/34] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Anordnen von Behältern, insbesondere von Flaschen, in gleichen Abständen | [2002/34] | English: | Device for equally spacing containers, in particular bottles | [2002/34] | French: | Dispositif pour espacer à distances égales des récipients, notamment des bouteilles | [2002/34] | Examination procedure | 20.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/17] | 27.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.02.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 20.08.2007 | [2007/47] | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]US4227606 (BOGATZKI HANS U) [X] 1-7,9 * column 3, line 51 - column 5, line 49 * * figures 1-5 * [A] 8 [Y] 10; | [YA]FR2725969 (INMARA AG [CH]) [Y] 10 * page 5, line 16 - page 6, line 33 * * figures 1-6 *[A] 11 |