EP1243454 - Movable hardtop for cabriolet divided along the longitudal vehicle axis into two roof panels [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.2004 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.08.2004 [2004/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CTS Fahrzeug-Dachsysteme GmbH Am Radeland 125 21079 Hamburg / DE | [2002/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wezyk, Wojciech Kocherstrasse 4 71065 Sindelfingen / DE | 02 /
Halbweiss, Thomas Bostonring 6 71686 Remseck / DE | [2002/39] | Representative(s) | Müller, Gottfried, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Am Ochsenberg 16 73614 Schorndorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/39] | Müller, Gottfried, et al Wittner & Müller Patentanwälte Am Ochsenberg 16 73614 Schorndorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 02003686.9 | 19.02.2002 | [2002/39] | Priority number, date | DE2001113428 | 19.03.2001 Original published format: DE 10113428 | [2002/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1243454 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1243454 | Date: | 13.08.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B60J7/14 | [2002/39] | CPC: |
B60J7/223 (EP,US);
B60J1/183 (EP,US);
B60J7/148 (EP,US);
B60J7/20 (EP,US);
B60J7/207 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2003/24] |
Former [2002/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verstellbares Hardtop-Cabrioletfahrzeugdach aus zwei entlang der Fahrzeuglängsachse geteilten Dachteilen | [2002/39] | English: | Movable hardtop for cabriolet divided along the longitudal vehicle axis into two roof panels | [2002/39] | French: | Toit rigide ouvrant pour un véhicule du type cabriolet, divisé le long de l'axe longitudinale en deux panneaux de toit | [2002/39] | Examination procedure | 23.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/43] | 02.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 11.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/32] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]DE4445580 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [DA] 1 * abstract *; | [DA]DE29601330U (HS PRODUCTS AG [DE]) [DA] 1 * page 3, line 21 - page 3, line 24 * * page 5, line 8 - page 5, line 16 * * figure 1; claims 1,3 * | by applicant | DE4445580 | DE29601330U |