EP1216737 - Conical filter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.08.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2005 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.10.2005 [2005/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DONALDSON COMPANY, INC. 1400 West 94th Street Minneapolis, MN 55440-1299 / US | [2002/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gillingham, Gary R. 17305 Felmming Lane Prior Lake, Minnesota 55372 / US | 02 /
Wagner, Wayne M. 120 Redwood Drive Apple Valley, Minnesota 55124 / US | 03 /
Risch, Daniel T. 1116 136th Street West Burnsville, Minnesota 55337 / US | 04 /
Rothman, Jim C. 332 Riverwoods Lane Burnsville, Minnesota 55337 / US | 05 /
Wahlquist, Fred H. 8444 11th Avenue South Bloomington, Minnesota 55420 / US | 06 /
Steinbeck, Edward A. 16671 N. Hillcrest Court Eden Prairie, Minnesota 55346 / US | 07 /
Carter, Steven A. 4847 Sheffield Circle Eagan, Minnesota 55122 / US | [2002/26] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/26] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Martinistrasse 24 28195 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 02003693.5 | 25.04.1997 | [2002/26] | Priority number, date | US19960638703 | 26.04.1996 Original published format: US 638703 | [2002/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1216737 | Date: | 26.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1216737 | Date: | 23.10.2002 | [2002/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B01D25/24, B01D25/00 | [2002/43] | CPC: |
B01D46/527 (EP,US);
B01D25/24 (EP,KR,US);
B01D25/001 (EP,US);
B01D27/06 (EP,US);
B01D46/0001 (EP,US);
B01D46/0043 (EP,US);
B01D46/10 (EP,US);
B01D46/52 (KR);
F02M35/02 (KR);
B01D2201/02 (EP,US);
B01D2275/201 (EP,US);
B01D2279/60 (EP,US);
Y10S55/05 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2002/26] | B01D25/24 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/26] | Title | German: | Konischer Filter | [2002/26] | English: | Conical filter | [2002/26] | French: | Filtre conique | [2002/26] | Examination procedure | 15.04.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/26] | 23.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.08.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/41] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP97922457.3 / EP0900115 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH07136435 ; | [A]US2599604 (BAUER JORDAN V, et al) [A] 1,7,8 * the whole document *; | [A]US3025963 (BAUER JORDAN V) [A] 1,7,8 * the whole document *; | [A]US4065341 (CUB FRITZ) [A] 1,2,4,5 * the whole document *; | [A]US4243535 (BEHRENDS BERTWIN E, et al) [A] 1,2,4,5* column 3; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US4310419 (NARA AKIO, et al) [A] 1,4,6 * figures 2,6 *; | [A]EP0152513 (NIPPON DENSO CO [JP]) [A] 1,7-12 * page 1, line 21 - line 29 * * page 4, line 21 - page 5, line 2 * * figures 2-5 *; | [A]EP0630672 (NIPPON DENSO CO [JP]) [A] 1,7,8 * the whole document * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950929), vol. 1995, no. 08, & JP07136435 A 19950530 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP) [X] 1,4-8,13,14 * abstract * * figures 3-6 * |