EP1213756 - Fabrication process of semiconductor package and semiconductor package [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.07.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2010 | Change - representative | published on 21.04.2010 [2010/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Chemical Co., Ltd. 1-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-04 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/24] | For all designated states HITACHI CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 1-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-04 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fukutomi, Naoki 8463-5, Yuki Yuki-shi, Ibaraki-ken 307 / JP | 02 /
Tsubomatsu, Yoshiaki 24-2, Migimomi Tsuchiura-shi, Ibaraki-ken 300 / JP | 03 /
Inoue, Fumio A403, Hitachi-Kasei-Shihoryo, 1-15-18, Hanabatake Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki-ken 305 / JP | 04 /
Yamazaki, Toshio 203, Hitachi-Matsushiro-House, 3-4-3, Matsushiro Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki-ken 305 / JP | 05 /
Ohhata, Hirohito 82-1 Imaizumi Shimotsuma-chi, Ibaraki / JP | 06 /
Hagiwara, Shinsuke 1278-302, Tamado Shimodate-shi, Ibaraki-ken 308 / JP | 07 /
Taguchi, Noriyuki 61-13, Nishitakenomaru Naka-ku, Yokohama / JP | 08 /
Nomura, Hiroshi 227, Ajito Oyama-shi, Tochigi-ken 329-02 / JP | [2002/45] |
Former [2002/24] | 01 /
Fukutomi, Naoki 8463-5, Yuki Yuki-shi, Ibaraki-ken 307 / JP | ||
02 /
Tsubomatsu, Yoshiaki 24-2, Migimomi Tsuchiura-shi, Ibaraki-ken 300 / JP | |||
03 /
Inoue, Fumio A403, Hitachi-Kasei-Shihoryo, 1-15-18, Hanabatake Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki-ken 305 / JP | |||
04 /
Yamazaki, Toshio 203, Hitachi-Matsushiro-House, 3-4-3, Matsushiro Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki-ken 305 / JP | |||
05 /
Ohhata, Hirohito B204, Hitachi-Kasei-Shihoryo, 1-15-18, Hanabatake Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki-ken 305 / JP | |||
06 /
Hagiwara, Shinsuke 1278-302, Tamado Shimodate-shi, Ibaraki-ken 308 / JP | |||
07 /
Taguchi, Noriyuki A504, Hitachi-Kasei-Shihoryo, 1-15-18, Hanabatake Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki-ken 305 / JP | |||
08 /
Nomura, Hiroshi 227, Ajito Oyama-shi, Tochigi-ken 329-02 / JP | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2008/30] | Jönsson, Hans-Peter, et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2002/24] | Jönsson, Hans-Peter, Dr., et al Patentanwälte, von Kreisling Selting Werner, Deichmannhaus am Dom 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 02003794.1 | 17.03.1995 | [2002/24] | Priority number, date | JP19940048760 | 18.03.1994 Original published format: JP 4876094 | JP19940273469 | 08.11.1994 Original published format: JP 27346994 | JP19950007683 | 20.01.1995 Original published format: JP 768395 | JP19950056202 | 15.03.1995 Original published format: JP 5620295 | [2002/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1213756 | Date: | 12.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1213756 | Date: | 25.05.2005 | [2005/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/68, H01L23/31, H01L23/498 | [2002/24] | CPC: |
H01L21/568 (EP,US);
H01L23/12 (KR);
H01L21/4803 (EP,US);
H01L21/56 (EP,US);
H01L21/561 (EP,US);
H01L23/3121 (EP,US);
H01L23/3128 (EP,US);
H01L23/49811 (EP,US);
H01L23/49816 (EP,US);
H01L23/4985 (EP,US);
H01L24/32 (EP,US);
H01L24/83 (EP,US);
H01L24/97 (EP,US);
H05K3/30 (KR);
H01L2221/68377 (EP,US);
H01L2224/16237 (EP,US);
H01L2224/2919 (EP,US);
H01L2224/29339 (EP);
H01L2224/32057 (EP,US);
H01L2224/32225 (EP,US);
H01L2224/32245 (EP,US);
H01L2224/32503 (EP,US);
H01L2224/45144 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48227 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48228 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48247 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73204 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73265 (EP,US);
H01L2224/83001 (EP,US);
H01L2224/83102 (EP,US);
H01L2224/8319 (EP,US);
H01L2224/83385 (EP,US);
H01L2224/8381 (EP,US);
H01L2224/8385 (EP,US);
H01L2224/85001 (EP,US);
H01L2224/92125 (EP,US);
H01L2224/97 (EP,US);
H01L24/45 (EP,US);
H01L24/48 (EP,US);
H01L24/73 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01005 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01006 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01015 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01019 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01027 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01029 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01033 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01047 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0105 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01078 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01079 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01082 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01322 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01327 (EP,US);
H01L2924/014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0665 (EP,US);
H01L2924/07802 (EP,US);
H01L2924/07811 (EP,US);
H01L2924/12042 (EP,US);
H01L2924/14 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15153 (EP,US);
H01L2924/1517 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15183 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15184 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15311 (EP,US);
H01L2924/181 (EP,US);
H01L2924/203 (EP,US);
H01L2924/351 (EP,US);
H05K3/20 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/2919, H01L2924/0665, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/45144, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/45144, H01L2924/00015 (US,EP);
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/73204, H01L2224/16225, H01L2224/32225, H01L2924/00 (EP);
H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32225, H01L2224/48227 (US,EP);
H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32225, H01L2224/48227, H01L2924/00012 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32225, H01L2224/48247, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32245, H01L2224/48227, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32245, H01L2224/48247, H01L2924/00 (US);
H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32245, H01L2224/48247, H01L2924/00012 (US,EP);
H01L2224/92247, H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32245, H01L2224/48247, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2224/97, H01L2224/73204 (US,EP);
H01L2224/97, H01L2224/73265 (US,EP);
H01L2224/97, H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32225, H01L2224/48227, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/97, H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32245, H01L2224/48247, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/97, H01L2224/83 (US,EP);
H01L2224/97, H01L2224/85 (US,EP);
H01L2224/97, H01L2224/92247 (US,EP);
H01L2224/97, H01L2224/92247, H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32225, H01L2224/48227, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/97, H01L2924/15311 (US,EP);
H01L2224/97, H01L2924/15311, H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32225, H01L2224/48227, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/0665, H01L2924/00, H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32225, H01L2224/48227, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2924/12042, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/15311, H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32225, H01L2224/48227, H01L2924/00012 (US,EP);
H01L2924/181, H01L2924/00012 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/24] | Title | German: | Halbleitergehäuseherstellung und Halbleitergehäuse | [2002/24] | English: | Fabrication process of semiconductor package and semiconductor package | [2002/24] | French: | Méthode de fabrication d'un boîtier semi-conducteur et boîtier semi-conducteur | [2002/24] | Examination procedure | 20.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/24] | 16.07.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/36] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP95912471.0 / EP0751561 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH02153542 ; | [Y]EP0391790 (SGS THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS [FR]) [Y] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0582052 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [Y] 1-18 * figures 3-6 *; | [PA]WO9422168 (OLIN CORP [US]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900904), vol. 014, no. 408, Database accession no. (E - 0972), & JP02153542 A 19900613 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-18 * abstract * |