EP1234909 - Active ironing board [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2005 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 04.05.2005 [2005/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EKO S.p.A. Via Condotti Bardini, 9 31058 SUSEGANA (TREVISO) / IT | [2004/27] |
Former [2002/35] | For all designated states ESSE85 S.r.l. Via Condotti Bardini, 13 I-31058 Susegana / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Loger, Jean-Michel 14 Rue Paul Cézanne 67170 Brumath / FR | 02 /
Papetti, Carlo 65 Rue d'Adelshoffen 67300 Schiltigheim / FR | 03 /
Roussel, Johannes 9 Rue du Rosenmeer 67560 Rosenwiller / FR | [2002/35] | Representative(s) | Lanzoni, Luciano Bugnion SpA Via G. Garibaldi 19 37121 Verona / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2002/35] | Lanzoni, Luciano c/o BUGNION S.p.A. Via G. Garibaldi n. 19 37121 Verona / IT | Application number, filing date | 02003966.5 | 22.02.2002 | [2002/35] | Priority number, date | FR20010002508 | 23.02.2001 Original published format: FR 0102508 | [2002/35] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1234909 | Date: | 28.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1234909 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | D06F81/08 | [2002/35] | CPC: |
D06F81/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/35] | Extension states | SI | 12.08.2002 | Title | German: | Aktiver Bügeltisch | [2002/35] | English: | Active ironing board | [2002/35] | French: | Table à repasser active | [2002/35] | Examination procedure | 24.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.02.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 06.05.2004 | DK | 06.08.2004 | [2005/18] |
Former [2005/02] | FI | 06.05.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2495468 (MUELLER LLOYD R); | [A]FR2641554 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2656879 (SUPERBA SA [FR]); | [A]US6138390 (WU HANK [TW]) [A] 1 * the whole document * |