EP1243737 - Fixing device for a casing frame in a wall opening [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.01.2005 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.02.2005 [2005/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states H & K Teckentrup KG Industriestrasse 50 33415 Verl / DE | [2002/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schramm Andreas Feldrain 6a 06193 Wallwitz Sylbitz / DE | 02 /
Wegener Hartmut Karl-Liebknecht-Strasse 23 06862 Jeber-Bergfrieden / DE | [2002/39] | Representative(s) | Strauss, Hans-Jochen Postfach 2452 33254 Gütersloh / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/39] | Strauss, H.-J., Dr. Postfach 2452 33254 Gütersloh / DE | Application number, filing date | 02004058.0 | 23.02.2002 | [2002/39] | Priority number, date | DE2001204856U | 21.03.2001 Original published format: DE 20104856 U | [2002/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1243737 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1243737 | Date: | 12.11.2003 | [2003/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | E06B1/60 | [2002/39] | CPC: |
E06B1/6015 (EP);
E06B1/6023 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2004/32] |
Former [2002/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Befestigung eines Zargenrahmens in einer Wandöffnung | [2002/39] | English: | Fixing device for a casing frame in a wall opening | [2002/39] | French: | Dispositif de fixation d'un dormant dans une ouverture murale | [2002/39] | Examination procedure | 13.05.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/08] | 20.09.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/08] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 02.07.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.07.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.07.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 02.07.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 02.07.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.07.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 02.07.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 02.07.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 02.07.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 02.07.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 02.07.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 02.07.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.07.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.07.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 02.07.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 02.07.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 02.07.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.07.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.07.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 02.07.2004 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2004 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19610488 (KUEFFNER ALUZARGEN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 8 - line 65; figure 2 *; | [A]DE19749472 (FISCHL JOSEPH [DE]) |