EP1237310 - Base station testing apparatus and method for testing a base station in a CDMA communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.10.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/36] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoshida, Katsuya, Nec Saitama, Ltd. 300-18, Aza Toyohara, Oaza Motohara, Kamikawamachi Kodama-gun, Saitama / JP | [2002/36] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/36] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02004248.7 | 26.02.2002 | [2002/36] | Priority number, date | JP20010050343 | 26.02.2001 Original published format: JP 2001050343 | [2002/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1237310 | Date: | 04.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1237310 | Date: | 05.10.2005 | [2005/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04B17/00, H04Q7/34 | [2002/36] | CPC: |
H04W24/00 (EP,US);
H04W24/06 (KR);
H04B17/15 (EP,US);
H04W16/22 (KR);
H04W88/08 (KR);
H04W36/18 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2006/24] |
Former [2002/36] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Testen einer Basisstation in einem CDMA Kommunikationssystem | [2002/36] | English: | Base station testing apparatus and method for testing a base station in a CDMA communication system | [2002/36] | French: | Procédé et appareil d'essai une station de base dans un système de communication à AMRC | [2002/36] | Examination procedure | 24.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/43] | 06.10.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5465393 (FROSTROM TORE [SE], et al); | [XD]EP1022872 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]); |