EP1225574 - Optical pickup [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.01.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.02.2006 [2006/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/30] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hasegawa, Shinya, Fujitsu Limited 1-1 Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | 02 /
Shibano, Motomichi, Fujitsu Limited 1-1 Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | [2002/30] | Representative(s) | Stebbing, Timothy Charles, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/30] | Stebbing, Timothy Charles, et al Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 02004364.2 | 18.08.1997 | [2002/30] | Priority number, date | JP19970066948 | 19.03.1997 Original published format: JP 6694897 | [2002/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1225574 | Date: | 24.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1225574 | Date: | 10.11.2004 | [2004/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/12, G11B11/10, G11B7/135 | [2002/30] | CPC: |
G11B7/1356 (EP,US);
G11B7/123 (EP,KR,US);
G11B11/10543 (EP,US);
G11B7/131 (EP,US);
G11B7/1353 (EP,KR,US);
G11B7/1376 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | [2005/30] |
Former [2002/30] | DE, FR, GB | Title | German: | Optische Abtastvorrichtung | [2002/30] | English: | Optical pickup | [2002/30] | French: | Dispositif de lecture optique | [2002/30] | Examination procedure | 11.05.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/08] | 13.09.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2006/08] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP97306251.6 / EP0866448 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 22.06.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.06.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 22.06.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 22.06.2005 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2005 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP7249242 ; | [A]JPS62141653 ; | [XY]US5404344 (IMADA NOBUO [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,7 * column 4, lines 1-45; figure 2 * [Y] 5,6 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960131), vol. 1996, no. 01, & JP7249242 A 19950926 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO LTD) [Y] 5,6 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19871203), vol. 011, no. 370, Database accession no. (P - 642), & JP62141653 A 19870625 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |