EP1236727 - Azabicyclo compounds as pesticides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.10.2003 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.12.2003 [2003/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer CropScience GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt/Main / DE | [2002/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lindell, Stephen Dr. Altenhainer Strasse 15 65779 Kelkheim-Fishbach / DE | 02 /
Dickhaut, Joachim Dr. Steubenstrasse 54/1 69121 Heidelberg / DE | 03 /
Jakobi, Harald Dr. Grosser Hasenpfad 80 60598 Frankfurt / DE | 04 /
Tiebes, Jörg Dr. Am Schwalbenschwanz 25 60431 Frankfurt / DE | 05 /
Jans, Daniela Dr. Schöne Aussicht 11 61348 Bad Homburg V.D.H. / DE | 06 /
Thönessen, Maria-Theresia Frauenlobstrasse 10 55262 Heidesheim / DE | 07 /
Waibel, Jutta Maria Manderscheider Strasse 51 60529 Frankfurt / DE | [2002/36] | Application number, filing date | 02004472.3 | 27.02.2002 | [2002/36] | Priority number, date | EP20010105017 | 01.03.2001 Original published format: EP 01105017 | [2002/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1236727 | Date: | 04.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C07D487/08, A01N43/90 | [2002/36] | CPC: |
C07D451/04 (EP);
A01N43/90 (EP);
C07D487/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2003/21] |
Former [2002/36] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Azabicycloverbindungen als Pestizide | [2002/36] | English: | Azabicyclo compounds as pesticides | [2002/36] | French: | Composés azabicylco comme pesticides | [2002/36] | Examination procedure | 05.03.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/50] | 08.07.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/50] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 15.04.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.04.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.04.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 15.04.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 15.04.2003 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.04.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 15.04.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 15.04.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 15.04.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 15.04.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 15.04.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 15.04.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.04.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.04.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 15.04.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 15.04.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 15.04.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.04.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.04.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 15.04.2003 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE2019536 (BASF AG) [AD] 1-13* claim 1 *; | [X]EP0414394 (BEECHAM GROUP PLC [GB]) [X] 1,3,9 * page 7, line 13 - line 22; claim 1 *; | [A]US5244906 (DICK MICHAEL R [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * column 16 - column 17 *; | [PX]WO0115532 (AVENTIS CROPSCIENCE GMBH [DE]) [PX] 1,2,4-13 * examples 28,92,119,129; claim 1 * |