EP1239228 - Extracting hood [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.03.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.04.2009 [2009/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Imperial-Werke oHG Installstrasse 10-18 32257 Bünde / DE | [2002/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baehr, Thomas Eichendroffstrasse 5 59846 Sundern / DE | 02 /
Hahn, Uwe Eichenallee 153 33332 Gütersloh / DE | 03 /
Henkenjohann, Michael Laurentiusgasse 11 33098 Paderborn / DE | 04 /
Nolte, Heinz-Gerhard Steinstrasse 18 59757 Arnsberg / DE | 05 /
Ricke, Michael Fürstenbergstrasse 13 59757 Arnsberg / DE | [2002/37] | Representative(s) | Neisen, Jürgen Miele & Cie. GmbH & Co. 33325 Gütersloh / DE | [2002/37] | Application number, filing date | 02004498.8 | 27.02.2002 | [2002/37] | Priority number, date | DE2001110818 | 06.03.2001 Original published format: DE 10110818 | [2002/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1239228 | Date: | 11.09.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1239228 | Date: | 25.02.2004 | [2004/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F24C15/20 | [2002/37] | CPC: |
F24C15/2064 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/37] | Title | German: | Dunstabzugshaube | [2002/37] | English: | Extracting hood | [2002/37] | French: | Hotte d'évacuation | [2002/37] | Examination procedure | 13.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/38] | 02.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/15] | 18.11.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3046751 (MAYER KG GEBR [DE]) [A] 1-6 * page 8, line 4 - page 10, line 2; figure - *; | [X]DE29800776U (ATAG KITCHEN GROUP BV [NL]) [X] 1-3,5 * page 3, paragraph 3 - page 4, paragraph 2 * * page 6, paragraph 5 - page 7, paragraph 3; figure -; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0940635 (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [E]EP1296097 (MIELE & CIE [DE]) [E] 1-6 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0014]; figure 2 *; | [E]DE10151732 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [E] 1-6* column 3, paragraph 20 * |