EP1240938 - Reverse osmosis plant [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.2010 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Michelbach, Ludwig Elsternweg 3 90513 Zirndorf / DE | [2002/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/38] | Representative(s) | Zech, Stefan Markus, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 47 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/38] | Zech, Stefan Markus Dipl.-Phys., et al Patentanwälte Meissner, Bolte & Partner Karolinenstrasse 27 90402 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 02004573.8 | 28.02.2002 | [2002/38] | Priority number, date | DE2001112719 | 14.03.2001 Original published format: DE 10112719 | DE2001112725 | 14.03.2001 Original published format: DE 10112725 | DE2001112730 | 14.03.2001 Original published format: DE 10112730 | [2002/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1240938 | Date: | 18.09.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1240938 | Date: | 06.05.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/19] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP1240938 | Date: | 16.09.2009 | [2009/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B01D61/12, B01D61/02, C02F1/44 | [2002/38] | CPC: |
B01D61/08 (EP,US);
B01D61/10 (EP);
B01D61/12 (EP);
C02F1/441 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/38] | Title | German: | Umkehrosmose-Anlage | [2002/38] | English: | Reverse osmosis plant | [2002/38] | French: | Installation d'osmose inverse | [2002/38] | Examination procedure | 03.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/18] | 14.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP08166114.2 / EP2008703 | Opposition(s) | 09.02.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2006 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   03.05.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 06.05.2009 | DK | 06.05.2009 | FI | 06.05.2009 | IE | 06.05.2009 | NL | 06.05.2009 | TR | 06.05.2009 | SE | 06.08.2009 | GR | 07.08.2009 | PT | 06.09.2009 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/37] | CY | 06.05.2009 | |
DK | 06.05.2009 | ||
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
IE | 06.05.2009 | ||
NL | 06.05.2009 | ||
SE | 06.08.2009 | ||
GR | 07.08.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/47] | DK | 06.05.2009 | |
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
IE | 06.05.2009 | ||
NL | 06.05.2009 | ||
SE | 06.08.2009 | ||
GR | 07.08.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | DK | 06.05.2009 | |
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
IE | 06.05.2009 | ||
NL | 06.05.2009 | ||
SE | 06.08.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | FI | 06.05.2009 | |
IE | 06.05.2009 | ||
NL | 06.05.2009 | ||
SE | 06.08.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/52] | FI | 06.05.2009 | |
NL | 06.05.2009 | ||
SE | 06.08.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | FI | 06.05.2009 | |
NL | 06.05.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/49] | FI | 06.05.2009 | |
PT | 06.09.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH07284637 ; | [A]JPH06114372 ; | [A]JPS63270592 ; | [A]JPH09299944 ; | [A]JPH03181386 ; | [A]DE2444740 (TUCHENHAGEN OTTO); | [A]DE19748997 (SCHILLING CHEMIE GMBH U PRODUK [DE]); | Examination | JPS607989 | JPS6411610 | JPH10137754 |