EP1239099 - Roof structure comprising curved profiles with removable caps and an accessory [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 12.09.2007 [2007/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Verschuere, René Michel 12 Chaussée d'Herseaux 7730 Estaimpuis / BE | For all designated states Vlaemynck, Claudine Marie-Henriette 12, chaussée d'Herseaux 7730 Estaimpuis / BE | [2004/41] |
Former [2002/37] | For all designated states Verschuere, René Michel 12 Chaussée d'Herseaux 7730 Estaimpuis / BE | ||
For all designated states Vlaemynck, Claudine Marie Henriette 12 chaussée d'Herseaux 7730 Estaimpuis / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/37] | Representative(s) | Hennion, Jean-Claude, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie Immeuble Eurocentre (Euralille) 179 Boulevard de Turin 59777 Lille / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/37] | Hennion, Jean-Claude, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie, 27bis, rue du Vieux Faubourg 59800 Lille / FR | Application number, filing date | 02004788.2 | 01.03.2002 | [2002/37] | Priority number, date | FR20010002917 | 02.03.2001 Original published format: FR 0102917 | [2002/37] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1239099 | Date: | 11.09.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1239099 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | E04D13/03, E04F10/06, E04H3/16, E04B7/16 | [2002/37] | CPC: |
E04B7/166 (EP);
E04D13/032 (EP);
E04F10/0607 (EP);
E04H3/165 (EP);
E04D2003/0806 (EP);
E04D2003/0856 (EP);
E04D2003/0887 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/37] | Extension states | RO | 12.02.2003 | Title | German: | Dachkonstruktion mit gebogenen Profilen und abnehmbaren Latten und ein Zubehör | [2002/37] | English: | Roof structure comprising curved profiles with removable caps and an accessory | [2002/37] | French: | Structure de couverture comportant des profiles cintres a barretes amovibles et un accessoire | [2002/37] | Examination procedure | 12.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/16] | 14.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 15.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 29.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.10.2004 | FI | 06.10.2004 | IE | 06.10.2004 | IT | 06.10.2004 | TR | 06.10.2004 | DK | 06.01.2005 | GR | 06.01.2005 | SE | 06.01.2005 | DE | 08.01.2005 | CY | 01.03.2005 | MC | 31.03.2005 | [2007/37] |
Former [2007/20] | AT | 06.10.2004 | |
FI | 06.10.2004 | ||
IE | 06.10.2004 | ||
TR | 06.10.2004 | ||
DK | 06.01.2005 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
SE | 06.01.2005 | ||
DE | 08.01.2005 | ||
CY | 01.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2007/10] | AT | 06.10.2004 | |
FI | 06.10.2004 | ||
IE | 06.10.2004 | ||
TR | 06.10.2004 | ||
DK | 06.01.2005 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
SE | 06.01.2005 | ||
DE | 08.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 06.10.2004 | |
FI | 06.10.2004 | ||
IE | 06.10.2004 | ||
TR | 06.10.2004 | ||
DK | 06.01.2005 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
DE | 08.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 06.10.2004 | |
FI | 06.10.2004 | ||
IE | 06.10.2004 | ||
DK | 06.01.2005 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
DE | 08.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 06.10.2004 | |
FI | 06.10.2004 | ||
IE | 06.10.2004 | ||
DK | 06.01.2005 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
DE | 08.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 06.10.2004 | |
FI | 06.10.2004 | ||
IE | 06.10.2004 | ||
DK | 06.01.2005 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/36] | AT | 06.10.2004 | |
FI | 06.10.2004 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | FI | 06.10.2004 | |
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 06.10.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4462390 (HOLDRIDGE ROBERT B [US], et al) [A] 1,2,4,5 * figures 5-8 *; | [A]US4783861 (LEURENT CHISLAIN H [FR]) [A] 1,3 * figures 1-4 *; | [XA]US4850167 (BEARD PHILIP W [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,7,11 * column 7, line 27 - line 59; figures 6,8 * * column 7, line 57 - line 59 * [A] 4; | [A]EP0662548 (EBERSPAECHER J [DE]) [A] 1,3* figures 1,2 * |