EP1225759 - Video display apparatus with vertical scan velocity modulation and video display method therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.11.2005 [2005/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/30] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Uwabata, Hideyo 6-10-1-502, Magami-cho Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 569-1121 / JP | 02 /
Terai, Katsumi 1-10-6, Arakawa Higashiosaka-shi, Osaka 577-0843 / JP | 03 /
Miyata, Minoru 11-1-705, Shimizu Suita-shi, Osaka 565-0805 / JP | 04 /
Kitahara, Toshiaki 8-17-608, Motomachi Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-0082 / JP | 05 /
Okumura, Naoji 2-13-55-311, Nishishoji Minoo-shi, Osaka 562-0003 / JP | 06 /
Tanaka, Kazuto 2-2-6-604, Niono Hama Otsu-shi, Shiga 520-0801 / JP | [2002/30] | Representative(s) | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/30] | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 02004853.4 | 07.06.1999 | [2002/30] | Priority number, date | JP19980164913 | 12.06.1998 Original published format: JP 16491398 | JP19990035006 | 12.02.1999 Original published format: JP 3500699 | JP19990138395 | 19.05.1999 Original published format: JP 13839599 | [2002/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1225759 | Date: | 24.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1225759 | Date: | 24.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04N3/32, H04N3/30 | [2002/30] | CPC: |
H04N3/30 (EP,US);
H04N3/32 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/30] | Title | German: | Videoanzeigegerät mit Modulation der vertikalen Abtastgeschwindigkeit und Videoanzeigeverfahren dafür | [2002/30] | English: | Video display apparatus with vertical scan velocity modulation and video display method therefor | [2002/30] | French: | Appareil d'affichage vidéo à modulation de vitesse de balayage vertical et procédé d'affichage vidéo associé | [2002/30] | Examination procedure | 30.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/45] | 30.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 08.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99923940.3 / EP1088445 | Opposition(s) | 25.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH06284309 ; | [DA]JPH1023290 ; | [X]WO9205661 (THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS [FR]) [X] 1-5 * page 2, line 9 - line 21 * * page 3, line 31 - page 4, line 11; figures 4,5 *; | [X]EP0567931 (THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS [FR]) [X] 1-5 * page 3, line 53 - page 4, line 13 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950228), vol. 095, no. 001, & JP06284309 A 19941007 (SONY CORP) [A] 1-5 * abstract * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980430), vol. 098, no. 005, & JP10023290 A 19980123 (VICTOR CO OF JAPAN LTD) [DA] * abstract * |