EP1318421 - Optical fiber holding device, optical dispersion-equalizer, and method of manufacturing optical fiber holding device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.09.2012 [2012/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2006/18] |
Former [2003/24] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hashimoto, Takashi, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K. K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
Hashimoto, Minoru, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K. K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2011/42] |
Former [2003/24] | 01 /
Hashimoto, Takashi, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K. K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | ||
02 /
Hashimoto, Minoru, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K. K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/42] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 13 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/28] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 13 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/24] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Mozartstrasse 17 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02004935.9 | 05.03.2002 | [2003/24] | Priority number, date | JP20010376169 | 10.12.2001 Original published format: JP 2001376169 | [2003/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1318421 | Date: | 11.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1318421 | Date: | 01.09.2004 | [2004/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1318421 | Date: | 19.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/293, G02B6/42, G02F1/01 | [2004/36] | CPC: |
G02B6/29322 (EP,US);
G02B6/02 (KR);
G02B6/29394 (EP,US);
G02B6/29395 (EP,US);
G02B6/3636 (EP,US);
G02B6/02204 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2003/24] | G02B6/293 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2005/20] |
Former [2003/24] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Optische Faserhaltevorrichtung, optischer Dispersionsentzerrer und Herstellungsverfahren für diese optische Faserhaltevorrichtung | [2003/24] | English: | Optical fiber holding device, optical dispersion-equalizer, and method of manufacturing optical fiber holding device | [2003/24] | French: | Dispositif de maintien d'une fibre optique, égalisateur de dispersion optique, et procédé de fabrication dudit dispositif de maintien d'une fibre optique | [2003/24] | Examination procedure | 29.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/53] | 07.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 05.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) GB, IT | 06.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.05.2011 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 08.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 02.09.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.12.2004 | Opposition(s) | 20.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 07.04.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 07.04.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9919755 (CORNING INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-10,12,13 * page 5, line 3 - line 5 * * page 8, line 9 - page 12, line 23 *; | [Y]US6229827 (FERNALD MARK R [US], et al) [Y] 8,9 * column 7, line 45 - line 49 * * column 8, line 13 - line 16 *; | [Y]WO0153880 (CORNING INC [US]) [Y] 1-10,12,13 * page 3 - page 4; figures 1,3,4,8,9 * * page 8, line 22 - line 44 * * page 12, line 3 - page 15, line 14 *; | [X]US2001026665 (ANDO KAZUNORI [JP], et al) [X] 11* figures 1,20 * | Examination | JP2000009949 | JP2000252920 |