EP1239509 - Lens assembly for electron beam column [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.01.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.02.2008 [2008/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIKON CORPORATION Fuji Building 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/37] | For all designated states Nikon Corporation Fuji Building, 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sogard, Michael 516 Placitas Avenue Menlo Park, California 94025 / US | [2002/37] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/37] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02004970.6 | 05.03.2002 | [2002/37] | Priority number, date | US20010797955 | 05.03.2001 Original published format: US 797955 | [2002/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1239509 | Date: | 11.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/141, H01J37/18, H01J37/301 | [2002/37] | CPC: |
H01J37/18 (EP,US);
H01J37/141 (EP,US);
H01J37/301 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2003/22] |
Former [2002/37] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Linsenaufbau für Elektronenstrahlsaüle | [2002/37] | English: | Lens assembly for electron beam column | [2002/37] | French: | Assemblage de lentilles pour colonne à faisceau d'électrons | [2002/37] | Examination procedure | 18.10.2002 | Examination requested [2002/51] | 12.03.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 02.07.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, PT, SE, TR | 20.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/09] | 08.10.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 17.04.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.04.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.04.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 17.04.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 17.04.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 17.04.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 17.04.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 17.04.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 17.04.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.04.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.04.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 17.04.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 17.04.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.04.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.04.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP01041155 ; | [A]JPH11111205 ; | [A]US5250808 (DANILATOS GERASIMOS D [AU], et al) [A] 1,12,21 * column 4, line 44 - column 6, line 54; figure 2 *; | [A]US5412211 (KNOWLES W RALPH [US]) [A] 1,12,21 * column 14, line 63 - column 15, line 65; figures 3,14,15 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890530), vol. 013, no. 235, Database accession no. (E - 766), & JP01041155 A 19890213 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1,3-5,7,11,12,20,21 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990730), vol. 1999, no. 09, & JP11111205 A 19990423 (HITACHI LTD;HITACHI SCI SYST LTD) [A] 1,12,21 * abstract * | Examination | EP0331859 |